This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2020 at 11:35:56 (UTC).

Austin et al v. Glynn County, Georgia

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 Austin filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Glynn County, Georgia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ernest Fuller, III

Langston Austin

Defendants

Glynn County, Georgia

E. Neal Jump

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas A. Withers

Attorney at Gillen Withers & Lake, LLC

P.O. Box 10164

Savannah, GA 31412

Joseph Richard Padgett

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith PC

3528 Darien Highway, Suite 300

Brunswick, GA 31522

Peter Andrew Lampros

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

400 Galleria Pkwy Se, Suite 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

400 Galleria Pkwy Se, Suite 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorneys

Emily Rose Hancock

Attorney at Brown, Readdick & Bumgartner

P.O. Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521

Richard K. Strickland

Attorney at Brown, Readdick, Bumgartner, Carter, Strickland

P.O. Box 220, 5 Glynn Avenue

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Aaron W. Mumford

Attorney at Glynn County Attorney's Office

701 G St., 2Nd Fl

Brunswick, GA 31520

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

13 #2

Exhibit 2- Redline Comparison of First Amended Complaint to Proposed Second Amen

13 #1

Exhibit 1- Proposed Second Amended Complaint

#13

#12

11 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Coll

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

#6

5 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismisss

#5

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (Van Remmen, Gordon) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Intent to File Reply by Glynn County, Georgia, E. Neal Jump re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction). (Hancock, Emily) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Glynn County, Georgia, E. Neal Jump. (Hancock, Emily) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. (Lampros, Peter) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (ca) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. Responses due by 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Redline Comparison of First Amended Complaint to Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Van Remmen, Gordon) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. E. Neal Jump served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Van Remmen, Gordon) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss #7 Amended Complaint. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by Glynn County, Georgia, E. Neal Jump. Responses due by 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint)(Strickland, Richard) Modified on 8/5/2020 (csr). (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 08/04/2020. (MG) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to E. Neal Jump. (ca) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Submitted (Lampros, Peter) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lampros, Peter) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Van Remmen, Gordon) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Glynn County, Georgia. Responses due by 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismisss)(Strickland, Richard) Modified on 7/31/2020 (jlh). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. All Defendants. (Lampros, Peter) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/7/2020. (ca) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Glynn County, Georgia. (ca) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400, receipt number AGASDC-2874839. (ca) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Langston Austin, Ernest Fuller, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glynn County, Georgia is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas A. Withers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Andrew Lampros