This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2020 at 07:53:24 (UTC).

Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. v. Yeshwant et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Yeshwant. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04688

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc.

Defendants

Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992

Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992

Akhileswari Yeshwant

Chilakamarri Yeshwant

B Windsor LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A. Baugh

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP

135 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60603

Daniel Hetzel

Attorney at Kaufman, Dolowich & Voluck, LLP

135 South Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic motion hearing held on 9/1/2020. The Court is persuaded that no forum or Judge shopping took place and therefore reaffirms the termination of the present case. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

12 #6

Exhibit D. Hetzel's 8/27/2020 letter to the court

12 #5

Exhibit Court's 8/27/2020 ECF notification

12 #4

Exhibit M. Fitapelli's 8/26/20 email to Plaintiff's counsel

12 #3

Exhibit FINRA's 8/12/2020 letter to the parties

12 #2

Exhibit Defendant's 8/12/2020 letter to FINRA

12 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's 8/11/2020 letter to FINRA

#12

(#12) REPLY by Defendants Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, B Windsor LLC, Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Akhileswari Yeshwant, Chilakamarri Yeshwant to set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,, #9 , response in opposition to motion, #7 , other, #10 , order on motion to dismiss, terminated case #8 , Response #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's 8/11/2020 letter to FINRA, #2 Exhibit Defendant's 8/12/2020 letter to FINRA, #3 Exhibit FINRA's 8/12/2020 letter to the parties, #4 Exhibit M. Fitapelli's 8/26/20 email to Plaintiff's counsel, #5 Exhibit Court's 8/27/2020 ECF notification, #6 Exhibit D. Hetzel's 8/27/2020 letter to the court)(Fitapelli, Marc) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

11 #3

Exhibit 3

11 #2

Exhibit 2

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) RESPONSE by Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hetzel, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit Letter to Justice Kocoras

#10

(#10) Copy of Letter to Justice Kocoras by Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, B Windsor LLC, Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Akhileswari Yeshwant, Chilakamarri Yeshwant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Justice Kocoras)(Fitapelli, Marc) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court was unaware of Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion to close case when it entered an order on the motion. The Court takes the opposition as a motion to reconsider the closing of the case, and as amounting to an accusation of forum-shopping. The Court directs Plaintiff to file a response to the motion by 8/28/2020 and directs Defendant to file a reply to the response by 8/31/2020. Ruling is set for 9/1/2020 at 9:40 AM, by telephone using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. (mk) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

7 #2

Exhibit B. August 21, 2020 order from FINRA

7 #1

Exhibit A. August 11, 2020 letter to FINRA

#7

(#7) RESPONSE by Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, B Windsor LLC, Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Akhileswari Yeshwant, Chilakamarri Yeshwantin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. to dismiss Motion to Close Case #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. August 11, 2020 letter to FINRA, #2 Exhibit B. August 21, 2020 order from FINRA)(Fitapelli, Marc) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic motion hearing held on 9/1/2020. The Court is persuaded that no forum or Judge shopping took place and therefore reaffirms the termination of the present case. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY by Defendants Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, B Windsor LLC, Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Akhileswari Yeshwant, Chilakamarri Yeshwant to set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,, #9 , response in opposition to motion, #7 , other, #10 , order on motion to dismiss, terminated case #8 , Response #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's 8/11/2020 letter to FINRA, #2 Exhibit Defendant's 8/12/2020 letter to FINRA, #3 Exhibit FINRA's 8/12/2020 letter to the parties, #4 Exhibit M. Fitapelli's 8/26/20 email to Plaintiff's counsel, #5 Exhibit Court's 8/27/2020 ECF notification, #6 Exhibit D. Hetzel's 8/27/2020 letter to the court)(Fitapelli, Marc) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE by Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hetzel, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Copy of Letter to Justice Kocoras by Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, B Windsor LLC, Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Akhileswari Yeshwant, Chilakamarri Yeshwant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Justice Kocoras)(Fitapelli, Marc) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court was unaware of Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion to close case when it entered an order on the motion. The Court takes the opposition as a motion to reconsider the closing of the case, and as amounting to an accusation of forum-shopping. The Court directs Plaintiff to file a response to the motion by 8/28/2020 and directs Defendant to file a reply to the response by 8/31/2020. Ruling is set for 9/1/2020 at 9:40 AM, by telephone using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. (mk) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to close case #5 is granted. The motion to stay arbitration is withdrawn. The Clerk is directed to terminate this case. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE by Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, B Windsor LLC, Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Akhileswari Yeshwant, Chilakamarri Yeshwantin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. to dismiss Motion to Close Case #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. August 11, 2020 letter to FINRA, #2 Exhibit B. August 21, 2020 order from FINRA)(Fitapelli, Marc) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17363304. (Fitapelli, Marc) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. to dismiss Motion to Close Case (Baugh, David) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. by Daniel Hetzel (Hetzel, Daniel) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. by David A. Baugh (Baugh, David) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Baugh, David) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Arbitration Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-17299056. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baugh, David) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less