This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 08:53:34 (UTC).

Aulds et al v. Walmart Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Aulds filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Kayla D McClusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01483

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Kayla D McClusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nicole Ayala Aulds

Tony Aulds

Defendants

Walmart Inc

Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C

White-Spunner Construction L L C

National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA

United Site Services of Texas Inc

Safety National Casualty Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Wynn Downs

Attorney at Downs Law Firm (MON)

4214 Sterlington Rd

Monroe, LA 71203

Earl Ross Downs, Jr

Attorney at Downs Law Firm (BASTROP)

517 N Washington St

Bastrop, LA 71220

Hayden Sierra Downs

Attorney at Downs Law Firm (BASTROP)

517 N Washington St

Bastrop, LA 71220

Earl Ross Downs, III

Attorney at Downs Law Firm (BASTROP)

517 N Washington St

Bastrop, LA 71220

Defendant Attorneys

Scott R Wolf

Attorney at Blanchard Walker et al

P O Drawer 1126

Shreveport, LA 71163-1126

Stacey D Williams

Attorney at Blanchard Walker et al

P O Drawer 1126

Shreveport, LA 71163-1126

Brian Seth Schaps

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles (NO)

755 Magazine St

New Orleans, LA 70130-3672

Eleanor Schutte

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles (NO)

755 Magazine St

New Orleans, LA 70130-3672

Caroline M Murley

Attorney at Taylor Wellons et al (NO)

1555 Poydras St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Karina Shareen

Attorney at Taylor Wellons et al (NO)

1555 Poydras St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Paula M Wellons

Attorney at Taylor Wellons et al (NO)

1555 Poydras St Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) JOINT RULE 26(f) Report by Nicole Ayala Aulds, Tony Aulds, White-Spunner Construction L L C, Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, United Site Services of Texas, Inc, Safety National Casualty Corp and National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA. (aty,Downs, Earl) Modified filers on 7/29/2022 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safety National Casualty Corp, United Site Services of Texas, Inc identifying Corporate Parent United Site Services Inc for United Site Services of Texas, Inc, Corporate Parent Delphi Financial Group, Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings Inc for Safety National Casualty Corp. (aty,Shareen, Karina) Modified to edit docket text on 7/15/2022 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#15

(#15) SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #7 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Caroline M Murley on behalf of Safety National Casualty Corp, United Site Services of Texas Inc. Show Cause Response due by 7/27/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#14

(#14) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/26/2022. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/5/2022. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, White-Spunner Construction L L C identifying Corporate Parent American International Group Inc, Corporate Parent A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, Corporate Parent A I G Property Casualty Inc for National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA. (aty,Schaps, Brian) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #11 Answer to Complaint, sent to Brian Seth Schaps on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, White-Spunner Construction L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/14/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, White-Spunner Construction L L C.(aty,Schaps, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Walmart Inc identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East L P, Corporate Parent W S E Management L L C, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East L L C for Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Wolf, Scott) Modified to edit corporate parents on 6/29/2022 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Answer to Complaint, sent to Scott R Wolf on behalf of Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Walmart Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/13/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#3

(#3) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/7/2022. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/6/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

1 #4

Civil cover sheet

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Caroline M Murley on behalf of Safety National Casualty Corp, United Site Services of Texas Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/12/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) JOINT RULE 26(f) Report by Nicole Ayala Aulds, Tony Aulds, White-Spunner Construction L L C, Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, United Site Services of Texas, Inc, Safety National Casualty Corp and National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA. (aty,Downs, Earl) Modified filers on 7/29/2022 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safety National Casualty Corp, United Site Services of Texas, Inc identifying Corporate Parent United Site Services Inc for United Site Services of Texas, Inc, Corporate Parent Delphi Financial Group, Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings Inc for Safety National Casualty Corp. (aty,Shareen, Karina) Modified to edit docket text on 7/15/2022 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #7 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Caroline M Murley on behalf of Safety National Casualty Corp, United Site Services of Texas Inc. Show Cause Response due by 7/27/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/26/2022. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/5/2022. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, White-Spunner Construction L L C identifying Corporate Parent American International Group Inc, Corporate Parent A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, Corporate Parent A I G Property Casualty Inc for National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA. (aty,Schaps, Brian) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #11 Answer to Complaint, sent to Brian Seth Schaps on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, White-Spunner Construction L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/14/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA, White-Spunner Construction L L C.(aty,Schaps, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Walmart Inc identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East L P, Corporate Parent W S E Management L L C, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East L L C for Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Wolf, Scott) Modified to edit corporate parents on 6/29/2022 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Answer to Complaint, sent to Scott R Wolf on behalf of Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Walmart Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/13/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Walmart Inc.(aty,Wolf, Scott) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Caroline M Murley on behalf of Safety National Casualty Corp, United Site Services of Texas Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/12/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safety National Casualty Corp, United Site Services of Texas Inc.(aty,Murley, Caroline) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Original Petition for Damages , filed by Nicole Ayala Aulds. United Site Services of Texas Inc, White-Spunner Construction L L C served May 18, 2022. Answers due 6/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Cards)(aty,Downs, Emily) Modified to add answer due date on 6/28/2022 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Safety National Casualty Corp, United Site Services of Texas Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Murley, Caroline) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/7/2022. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/6/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 5:22-cv-1483 from Shreveport Division to Monroe Division. New Case Number 3:22-cv-1483. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 5th JDC, West Carroll Parish, Case Number 32424 with Jury Demand; ( Filing Fee: $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5127467) filed by Safety National Casualty Corp, United Site Services of Texas Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Caroline M Murley added to party Safety National Casualty Corp (pty:dft), Attorney Caroline M Murley added to party United Site Services of Texas Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Murley, Caroline) Modified to edit docket text on 6/6/2022 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Civil Case filing fee by SAFETY NATIONAL CASUALTY CORPORATION, UNITED SITE SERVICES OF TEXAS, INC.. ( Filing Fee: $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5127467) . (aty,Murley, Caroline) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED SITE SERVICES OF TEXAS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where Safety National Casualty Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA is a litigant