This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:21:49 (UTC).

AUKAMP-CORCORAN v. LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 AUKAMP-CORCORAN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05734

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHYANNE AUKAMP-CORCORAN

Defendant

LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDSAY JEAN HARNER O'NEIL

Attorney at GIBBEL KRAYBILL & HESS LLP

2933 Lititz Pike, Po Box 5349

Lancaster, PA 17606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207833.), filed by SHYANNE AUKAMP-CORCORAN.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHYANNE AUKAMP-CORCORAN. All Defendants. (O'NEIL, LINDSAY) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE against LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH filed by SHYANNE AUKAMP-CORCORAN.(jaa, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • 1 Summons Issued as to LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 1/30/20 (jaa, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE against LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH filed by SHYANNE AUKAMP-CORCORAN.(jaa, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHYANNE AUKAMP-CORCORAN. All Defendants. (O'NEIL, LINDSAY) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • 1 Summons Issued as to LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/6/2019 (bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHYANNE AUKAMP-CORCORAN. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against LANCASTER GENERAL HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207833.), filed by SHYANNE AUKAMP-CORCORAN.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.