This case was last updated from PACER on 05/08/2021 at 12:22:09 (UTC).

AUGUSTINE v. INCH et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 AUGUSTINE filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against INCH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are MARTIN A FITZPATRICK and WILLIAM STAFFORD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MARTIN A FITZPATRICK

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM STAFFORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIO AUGUSTINE

Clermont, FL 34715

Defendants

MARK INCH

DAVIS

BAINE

HIGHTOWER

SIMON

BRIGHTWELL

FRONTEK

ALFORD

CHRISTOPHER EDELEN

ASHLEY

SCARLATTI

ADAMS

MCCRAE

RAINY

GREEN

KENNEDY

DENMARK

S GAHRMANN

HERNANDEZ

133 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, ECF No. #7 is ACCEPTED. The Clerk of Court shall administratively close this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/12/2021. (cle) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Notice to the Court), filed by JULIO AUGUSTINE. (cle) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - Plaintiff's amended in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff is not required to prepay the filing fee. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $6.20. Plaintiff has until 4/13/2021, to submit the initial partial filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall mail this Order with an appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon payment of the assessed initial partial filing fee. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 3/12/2021. (cle) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by JULIO AUGUSTINE. (cle) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION For Appointment of Counsel, filed by JULIO AUGUSTINE. (cle) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by JULIO AUGUSTINE. (cle) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ADAMS, AGAPITO, ALFORD, ALLEN, ARNOLD, ARRIGO, ASHLEY, BADA, BAINE, BAINES, BARBER, BELIDUE, BLUNDHEIM, BOGACKZ, BOOTH, BRIGHTWELL, BROWN, BROWN, BROWN, BROWNSTEIN, BRYANT, BURKETT, BURLESON, BUSH, CAMILLE, CANNISTRACZ, CARSON, CARTER, CASSIDY, CHAVARRIA, CLAYTON, CLIFTON, CONNOR, COPEN, CORBETT, DARIUS, DAVIS, DENMARK, DITORO, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #12, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #14, JOHN DOE #15, JOHN DOE #16, JOHN DOE #17, JOHN DOE #18, JOHN DOE #19, JOHN DOE #2, JOHN DOE #20, JANE DOE #21, JOHN DOE #22, JOHN DOE #23, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #5, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #9, DOWIS, CHRISTOPHER EDELEN, LESTER FERNANDEZ, FERRER-CABAN, FERRIERA, FISHER, FLORES, FLOYD, FLOYD, FRONTEK, FROST, S GAHRMANN, GAMMON, GARZA, GODWIN, GRACY, GRAY, GREEN, GREGORY, HARRISON, HENDERSON, HERNANDEZ, HEWETT, HIGHTOWER, HILL, HODGES, HUNTER, MARK INCH, IZOR, JACKSON, JEAN-PIERRE, JOHNSON, JOLLEY, JONES, KENNEDY, KINDLETAN, KNIGHTON, LARNCE, LEE, MANNING, MARTIN, MATTHEW(OFFICER - SUWANNEE CI), MATTHEW(SGT - TAYLOR CI), MATTOX, MAYO, MAYS, MCCRAE, MENDOZA, MERITT, MICHEL, MILLER, MOCK, MONZO, MORALES, MUNDELLA, NELL, NESBITT, NEWDIGER(OFFICER - HOLMES CI), NICKS, NIXON, NORMAN, O'BRIEN, ODUM, PANTOJA, PATTERSON, PEACOCK, PENIX, PENNINGS, POE, PULLEY, RAINY, RAMIREZ, REAMS(OFFICER - TAYLOR CI), REAMS(SGT - TAYLOR CI), RICHARDS, ROBIN,, ROBINSON, J ROBINSON, ROSADO, SCARLATTI, SELLER, SIMON, D SNIDER, SNYDER, SWINDLE, TAYLOR(SGT - HOLMES CI), TAYLOR(OFFICER - HAMILTON CI), TAYLOR(OFFICER - WALTON CI), THOMAS(OFFICER - TAYLOR CI), THOMAS(MAJOR - HARDEE CI), THOMPSON, TORRES, TOWNSEND, VANN, WEB, WEST, WILLIAMS, and WILLIAMSON, filed by JULIO AUGUSTINE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (cle) *** No Service Copies provided. *** (Entered: 03/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, ECF No. #7 is ACCEPTED. The Clerk of Court shall administratively close this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/12/2021. (cle) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (cle) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Notice to the Court), filed by JULIO AUGUSTINE. (cle) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - Plaintiff's amended in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff is not required to prepay the filing fee. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $6.20. Plaintiff has until 4/13/2021, to submit the initial partial filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall mail this Order with an appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon payment of the assessed initial partial filing fee. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 3/12/2021. (cle) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, and #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Pro Se. (cle) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by JULIO AUGUSTINE. (cle) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION For Appointment of Counsel, filed by JULIO AUGUSTINE. (cle) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by JULIO AUGUSTINE. (cle) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ADAMS, AGAPITO, ALFORD, ALLEN, ARNOLD, ARRIGO, ASHLEY, BADA, BAINE, BAINES, BARBER, BELIDUE, BLUNDHEIM, BOGACKZ, BOOTH, BRIGHTWELL, BROWN, BROWN, BROWN, BROWNSTEIN, BRYANT, BURKETT, BURLESON, BUSH, CAMILLE, CANNISTRACZ, CARSON, CARTER, CASSIDY, CHAVARRIA, CLAYTON, CLIFTON, CONNOR, COPEN, CORBETT, DARIUS, DAVIS, DENMARK, DITORO, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #12, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #14, JOHN DOE #15, JOHN DOE #16, JOHN DOE #17, JOHN DOE #18, JOHN DOE #19, JOHN DOE #2, JOHN DOE #20, JANE DOE #21, JOHN DOE #22, JOHN DOE #23, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #5, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #9, DOWIS, CHRISTOPHER EDELEN, LESTER FERNANDEZ, FERRER-CABAN, FERRIERA, FISHER, FLORES, FLOYD, FLOYD, FRONTEK, FROST, S GAHRMANN, GAMMON, GARZA, GODWIN, GRACY, GRAY, GREEN, GREGORY, HARRISON, HENDERSON, HERNANDEZ, HEWETT, HIGHTOWER, HILL, HODGES, HUNTER, MARK INCH, IZOR, JACKSON, JEAN-PIERRE, JOHNSON, JOLLEY, JONES, KENNEDY, KINDLETAN, KNIGHTON, LARNCE, LEE, MANNING, MARTIN, MATTHEW(OFFICER - SUWANNEE CI), MATTHEW(SGT - TAYLOR CI), MATTOX, MAYO, MAYS, MCCRAE, MENDOZA, MERITT, MICHEL, MILLER, MOCK, MONZO, MORALES, MUNDELLA, NELL, NESBITT, NEWDIGER(OFFICER - HOLMES CI), NICKS, NIXON, NORMAN, O'BRIEN, ODUM, PANTOJA, PATTERSON, PEACOCK, PENIX, PENNINGS, POE, PULLEY, RAINY, RAMIREZ, REAMS(OFFICER - TAYLOR CI), REAMS(SGT - TAYLOR CI), RICHARDS, ROBIN,, ROBINSON, J ROBINSON, ROSADO, SCARLATTI, SELLER, SIMON, D SNIDER, SNYDER, SWINDLE, TAYLOR(SGT - HOLMES CI), TAYLOR(OFFICER - HAMILTON CI), TAYLOR(OFFICER - WALTON CI), THOMAS(OFFICER - TAYLOR CI), THOMAS(MAJOR - HARDEE CI), THOMPSON, TORRES, TOWNSEND, VANN, WEB, WEST, WILLIAMS, and WILLIAMSON, filed by JULIO AUGUSTINE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (cle) *** No Service Copies provided. *** (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brightwell is a litigant

Latest cases where Hightower is a litigant

Latest cases where RAINY is a litigant

Latest cases where ASHLEYS is a litigant