This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/09/2022 at 08:16:50 (UTC).

Augustine Rotibi v. Cox Enterprises, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 Augustine Rotibi filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Cox Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and John E. McDermott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04708

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Augustine Rotibi

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant

Cox Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Matthew K Wegner

Attorney at Brown Wegner LLP

2010 Main Street Suite 1260

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [DE #8 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) See Civil Minutes for further specifics. (jp) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

19 #1

Proposed Order on Request to Postpone

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, ORDERING Plaintiff Leave to file Amended Complaint; Memorandum in support of Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint; Proposed Order submitted by Plaintiff Augustine Rotibi received on 08/10/2022 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: (1) Written notice of motion lacking or timeliness of notice incorrect; (2) No Certification of Interested Parties and/or no copies; (3) No Proof of service attached to document(s); (4) Unclear as to whether document is a motion, request or application. If a motion, lacking hearing date and time. (jp) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amended Complaint to Have The Case Remanded Back to The Superior Court of California Equitable Relief #15 . The document(s) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. (jre) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

14 #1

Declaration of Matthew K. Wegner, with Exhibit A

14 #14

Main Document

#15

(#15) (DOCUMENT STRICKEN. See Order #16 .) - MOTION for Leave to file Amended Complaint to Have The Case Remanded Back to The Superior Court of California Equitable Relief filed by plaintiff Augustine Rotibi. (jp) Modified on 8/16/2022 (jre). (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#10

(#19) Joint REQUEST to Continue Rule 26 Disclosures and Scheduling Conference from August 29, 2022 to (vacate or continue for a short period of time) Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 filed by defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request to Postpone) (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#7

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on July 11, 2022 and July 15, 2022. (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#6

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on July 11, 2022 and July 15, 2022. (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#5

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on July 11, 2022 and July 15, 2022. (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#4

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on July 11, 2022 and July 15, 2022. (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc., (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc.. (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [DE #8 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) See Civil Minutes for further specifics. (jp) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint REQUEST to Continue Rule 26 Disclosures and Scheduling Conference from August 29, 2022 to (vacate or continue for a short period of time) Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 filed by defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request to Postpone) (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, ORDERING Plaintiff Leave to file Amended Complaint; Memorandum in support of Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint; Proposed Order submitted by Plaintiff Augustine Rotibi received on 08/10/2022 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: (1) Written notice of motion lacking or timeliness of notice incorrect; (2) No Certification of Interested Parties and/or no copies; (3) No Proof of service attached to document(s); (4) Unclear as to whether document is a motion, request or application. If a motion, lacking hearing date and time. (jp) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Defendants Motion to Dismiss #8 , calendared for hearing on 8/22/2022, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amended Complaint to Have The Case Remanded Back to The Superior Court of California Equitable Relief #15 . The document(s) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. (jre) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint against Cox Enterprises, Inc. For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [FRCP 12(b)(2)] #8 filed by Defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew K. Wegner, with Exhibit A)(Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to File Amended Complaint to Have the Case Remanded Back to the Superior Court of California and Equitable Relief #11 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): The document images attached to docket entries #11 and #12 do not match the text entry. The supposed motion is a proposed order. Further, if a motion was intended to be filed, no hearing date was set or requested. Accordingly, the documents are STRICKEN. Plaintiff shall properly refile the intended motion or request no later than 8/16/2022. (jre) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) (DOCUMENT STRICKEN. See Order #16 .) - MOTION for Leave to file Amended Complaint to Have The Case Remanded Back to The Superior Court of California Equitable Relief filed by plaintiff Augustine Rotibi. (jp) Modified on 8/16/2022 (jre). (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) (DOCUMENT STRICKEN. See #13 ) - MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for leave to File Amended Complaint to Have the Case Remanded Back to the Superior Court of California and Equitable Relief #11 filed by Plaintiff Augustine Rotibi. (jp) Modified on 8/9/2022 (jre). (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) (DOCUMENT STRICKEN. See #13 ) - PLAINTIFF MOTION to File Amended Complaint to Have the Case Remanded Back to the Superior Court of California and Equitable Relief filed by plaintiff Augustine Rotibi. (jp) Modified on 8/9/2022 (jre). (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on July 11, 2022 and July 15, 2022. (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint against Cox Enterprises, Inc. For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [FRCP 12(b)(2)] filed by defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities in support, #2 Declaration of Luis Avila in support, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 1 to RJN - E.D. Cal. Order in Martinez v Manheim Central California, et al., #5 Exhibit 2 to RJN - California Superior Court Order in Scotton v Manheim, Inc., et al., #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service) (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (sh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cox Enterprises, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Augustine Rotibi.[FILED IN STATE COURT 06/06/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc., (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc.. (Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 22SMCV00830 Receipt No: ACACDC-33606264 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Cox Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons) (Attorney Matthew K Wegner added to party Cox Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wegner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cox Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew K Wegner