This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2021 at 07:26:40 (UTC).

Augusta Riverfront, LLC v. Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Augusta Riverfront, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00128

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Augusta Riverfront, LLC doing business as Augusta Marriott at the Convention Center

Defendant

Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David E. Hudson

Attorney at Hull Barrett, PC

801 Broad Street, 7Th Floor

Augusta, GA 30903-1564

Defendant Attorney

Gregory R. Crochet

Attorney at Kutak Rock, LLP

303 Peachtree St., Ne, Suite 2750

Atlanta, GA 30308-3201

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #7

Main Document

#6

5 #7

Exhibit F

5 #6

Exhibit E

5 #5

Exhibit D

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #3

Exhibit B

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Briefs

5 #5

Main Document

#4

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/29/2021. (jlh) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Augusta Riverfront, LLC. (Hudson, David) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society re #8 Response. (Crochet, Gregory) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society filed by Augusta Riverfront, LLC. (Hudson, David) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Darryl C. Leech by Augusta Riverfront, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hudson, David) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Augusta Riverfront, LLC. (Hudson, David) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. Responses due by 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Briefs, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Crochet, Gregory) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. (Crochet, Gregory) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSet Deadline: Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society answer due 9/1/2021. (ca) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Removal NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/4/2021. Pending Motions due by 9/8/2021. (ca) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/25/2021. (ca) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Richmond County, Georgia, case number 2021RCCV00261. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3172706), filed by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ca). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory R. Crochet