This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2021 at 07:08:46 (UTC).

Augusta Hotel Group, LLC v. Selective Way Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 Augusta Hotel Group, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Selective Way Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles A. Pannell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04537

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Augusta Hotel Group, LLC

Defendant

Selective Way Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Scott Katz

Attorney at Katz Litigation Group, LLC

Suite 1805, 200 Galleria Parkway, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Chorkey Burke

Attorney at Morris Manning & Martin, LLP

1600 Atlanta Financial Center, 3343 Peachtree Rd., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1044

Seslee S. Smith

Attorney at Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP

1600 Atlanta Financial Center, 3343 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1044

Lauren Christine Dugas

Attorney at Morris Manning & Martin, LLP

1600 Atlanta Financial Center, 3343 Peachtree Rd., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1044

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Scheduling Order

#8

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B to Response

7 #1

Brief Exhibit A to Response

#7

#6

#5

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Brief in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss

#3

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production by Augusta Hotel Group, LLC.(Katz, Adam) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Smith, Seslee) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr.. (tcc) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Smith, Seslee) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Augusta Hotel Group, LLC.(Katz, Adam) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Smith, Seslee) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Daubert motions with regard to expert testimony shall be filed no later than 30 days after the close of discovery. The parties request for additional time to complete discovery due to COVID-19 restrictions is GRANTED. This case shall proceed on a 6-month discovery track. Discovery ends on 6/14/2021. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Smith, Seslee) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Augusta Hotel Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Exhibit A to Response, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B to Response)(Katz, Adam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Augusta Hotel Group, LLC by Augusta Hotel Group, LLC.(Katz, Adam) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Way Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. (SIGI) for Selective Way Insurance Company. (Smith, Seslee) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Complaint Attached Thereto by Selective Way Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 4/12/2021.(Smith, Seslee) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (Partial) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Brief in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Smith, Seslee) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (tcc) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10346781) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Way Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Scott Katz(Designation Retained)