This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:12:34 (UTC).

Augusta, Georgia et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Augusta, Georgia filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against McKinsey and Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00173

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Augusta, Georgia

Laurens County, Georgia

Defendant

McKinsey and Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas W. Tucker

Attorney at Tucker, Long, PC

P.O. Box 2426

Augusta, GA 30903

D. Bryant Chaffin

Attorney at McHugh Fuller Law Group, LLC

97 Elias Whiddon Road

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/23/2021. (ca) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Set Deadline: Compliance due by 12/7/2021. (ca) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER re: #3 Notice of Filing Deficiency. The Court Orders Plaintiff's counsel to make arrangements for admission to the Court within seven days of the date of this Order. The Court Directs the Clerk to serve this Order electronically on each attorney with an email address listed at the end of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/9/2021. (csr) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, Southern District of Mississippi

5 #2

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing by Augusta, Georgia, Laurens County, Georgia re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3248303, Fee Amount $200, Signature by Petitioner (Chaffin, D.) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#7

(#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. After two days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer. (slt) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit A - List of Cases

#9

(#9) ORDER granting re #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Douglas Bryant Chaffin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/17/21. (loh) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#10

(#10) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CVTO-19 RE MDL NO. 2996. Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 12/20/2021. (pts) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase transferred to District of Northern District of California. File Transferred Electronically. (pts) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CVTO-19 RE MDL NO. 2996. Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 12/20/2021. (pts) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting re #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Douglas Bryant Chaffin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/17/21. (loh) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (slt) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing by Augusta, Georgia, Laurens County, Georgia re #7 Notice (Other), #6 Notice of Filing to Satisfy Deficiency (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Cases)(Chaffin, D.) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Compliance with deficiency notice due by 12/20/2021. (slt) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. After two days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer. (slt) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing by Augusta, Georgia, Laurens County, Georgia re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3248303, Fee Amount $200, Signature by Petitioner (Chaffin, D.) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3248303, Fee Amount $200, by Augusta, Georgia, Laurens County, Georgia. Responses due by 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, Southern District of Mississippi, #2 Incorrect format PDF)(Chaffin, D.) Counsel's signature is filed at Notice #6 . (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 12/16/2021 re: #4 Order. (csr) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re: #3 Notice of Filing Deficiency. The Court Orders Plaintiff's counsel to make arrangements for admission to the Court within seven days of the date of this Order. The Court Directs the Clerk to serve this Order electronically on each attorney with an email address listed at the end of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/9/2021. (csr) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Set Deadline: Compliance due by 12/7/2021. (ca) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/23/2021. (ca) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $402, receipt number AGASDC-3232832. (ca) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against McKinsey and Company, Inc., filed by Augusta, Georgia, Laurens County, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D BRYANT CHAFFIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Tucker, III