This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2019 at 07:45:03 (UTC).

Audelo v. Holbrook et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Audelo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Holbrook. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00277

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hiran Joshua Audelo

Defendants

Wayne Coats

Jimmy Lee Holbrook

Western Surety Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.

Attorney at Hartzog Law Group LLP

1903 N. Harrison Avenue, Suite 200

Cary, NC 27513

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/26/2019. Copy sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Joseph P. Tunstall, III of O'Mally Tunstall, PLLC at Post Office Box 1158, Tarboro, NC 27886 mailed via US Mail on July 26, 2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#11

(#11) Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand) (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Wayne Coats answer due 8/9/2019; Jimmy Lee Holbrook answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/3/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to to Plaintiff's Counsel Joseph P. Tunstall, III of O'Mally Tunstall, PLLC at Post Office Box 1158, Tarboro, NC27886 mailed via US Mail on July 3, 2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

1 #10

Exhibit J - State Court Notice of Removal

1 #9

Exhibit I - Affidavit of Service on Western Surety

1 #8

Exhibit H - Letter to Clerk dated 6-11-19

1 #7

Exhibit G - Affidavit of Service on Coats

1 #6

Exhibit F - Affidavit of Service on Holbrook

1 #5

Exhibit E - Ltr to Clerk dated 5-31-19

1 #4

Exhibit D - Summons - Coats

1 #3

Exhibit C - Summons - Holbrook

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Civil Action Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook from Harnett County Superior Court, case number 19CVS01076. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5007771), filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons - Holbrook, #4 Exhibit D - Summons - Coats, #5 Exhibit E - Ltr to Clerk dated 5-31-19, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Service on Holbrook, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Service on Coats, #8 Exhibit H - Letter to Clerk dated 6-11-19, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Service on Western Surety, #10 Exhibit J - State Court Notice of Removal) (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/26/2019. Copy sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Joseph P. Tunstall, III of O'Mally Tunstall, PLLC at Post Office Box 1158, Tarboro, NC 27886 mailed via US Mail on July 26, 2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand) (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Wayne Coats answer due 8/9/2019; Jimmy Lee Holbrook answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/3/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to to Plaintiff's Counsel Joseph P. Tunstall, III of O'Mally Tunstall, PLLC at Post Office Box 1158, Tarboro, NC27886 mailed via US Mail on July 3, 2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Joseph P. Tunstall, III of O'Mally Tunstall, PLLC at Post Office Box 1158, Tarboro, NC27886 mailed via US Mail on July 3, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Wayne Coats (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jimmy Lee Holbrook (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr on behalf of Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Supplemental Cover Sheet. (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Action Cover Sheet. (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook from Harnett County Superior Court, case number 19CVS01076. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5007771), filed by Wayne Coats, Jimmy Lee Holbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons - Holbrook, #4 Exhibit D - Summons - Coats, #5 Exhibit E - Ltr to Clerk dated 5-31-19, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Service on Holbrook, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Service on Coats, #8 Exhibit H - Letter to Clerk dated 6-11-19, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Service on Western Surety, #10 Exhibit J - State Court Notice of Removal) (Hartzog, Dan) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less