This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2022 at 07:59:53 (UTC).

Auberry v. Fastest Media LLC

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 Auberry filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fastest Media LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernard A. Friedman and Curtis Ivy, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-12426

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bernard A. Friedman

Referral Judge

Curtis Ivy, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Montrez Auberry

Defendant

Fastest Media LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip L. Fraietta

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Frank S. Hedin

Attorney at Hedin Hall LLP

1395 Brickell Ave, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

Joseph I. Marchese

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Gregory A. Mitchell

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm, P.C.

950 W. University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

Sharon S. Almonrode

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm, P.C.

950 West University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

E. Powell Miller

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm

950 W. University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank S. Hedin on behalf of Montrez Auberry. (Hedin, Frank) (Entered: 10/30/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fastest Media LLC served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph I. Marchese appearing on behalf of Montrez Auberry (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Philip L. Fraietta appearing on behalf of Montrez Auberry (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued for *Fastest Media LLC* (DAll) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory A. Mitchell appearing on behalf of Montrez Auberry (Mitchell, Gregory) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sharon S. Almonrode appearing on behalf of Montrez Auberry (Almonrode, Sharon) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

1 #18

Exhibit Q - Californias Reader Privacy Act Signed into Law, Electronic Frontier

1 #13

Exhibit L - Fraud Against Seniors: Hearing before the Senate Special Committee

1 #12

Exhibit K - Charles Duhigg, Bilking the Elderly, With a Corporate Assist, N.Y. T

1 #10

Exhibit I - Bipartisan Group of Lawmakers Query Data Brokers About Practices Inv

1 #9

Exhibit H - Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committ

1 #8

Exhibit G - Natasha Singer, You for Sale: Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Gen

1 #7

Exhibit F - Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, TIME.com

1 #6

Exhibit E - Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour (Dec. 7, 2009)

1 #4

Exhibit C - The Information Marketplace: Merging and Exchanging Consumer Data (

1 #3

Exhibit B - Privacy: Sales, Rentals of Videos, etc., House Legislative Analysis

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank S. Hedin on behalf of Montrez Auberry. (Hedin, Frank) (Entered: 10/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fastest Media LLC served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph I. Marchese appearing on behalf of Montrez Auberry (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Philip L. Fraietta appearing on behalf of Montrez Auberry (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued for *Fastest Media LLC* (DAll) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory A. Mitchell appearing on behalf of Montrez Auberry (Mitchell, Gregory) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sharon S. Almonrode appearing on behalf of Montrez Auberry (Almonrode, Sharon) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint Jury Trial Demanded filed by Montrez Auberry against Fastest Media LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9086498 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Technowize Magazine Subscriber list of IT Professionals Mailing List, #3 Exhibit B - Privacy: Sales, Rentals of Videos, etc., House Legislative Analysis Section, H.B. No. 5331, Jan. 20, 1989, #4 Exhibit C - The Information Marketplace: Merging and Exchanging Consumer Data (Mar. 13, 2001), #5 Exhibit D - Webs Hot New Commodity: Privacy, WSJ (Feb. 28, 2011), #6 Exhibit E - Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour (Dec. 7, 2009), #7 Exhibit F - Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, TIME.com (July 31, 2012), #8 Exhibit G - Natasha Singer, You for Sale: Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Genome, N.Y. Times (June 16, 2012), #9 Exhibit H - Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, to Scott E. Howe, Chief Executive Officer, Acxiom (Oct. 9, 2012), #10 Exhibit I - Bipartisan Group of Lawmakers Query Data Brokers About Practices Involving Consumers Personal Information, Website of Senator Ed Markey (July 24, 2012), #11 Exhibit J - Prize Scams, Federal Trade Commission, #12 Exhibit K - Charles Duhigg, Bilking the Elderly, With a Corporate Assist, N.Y. Times, May 20, 2007, #13 Exhibit L - Fraud Against Seniors: Hearing before the Senate Special Committee on Aging (August 10, 2000), #14 Exhibit M - 2014 TRUSTe US Consumer Confidence Privacy Report, TRUSTe, #15 Exhibit N - Joshua Brustein, Start-Ups Seek to Help Users Put a Price on Their Personal Data, N.Y. Times (Feb. 12, 2012), #16 Exhibit O - European Network and Information Security Agency, Study on monetising privacy (Feb. 27, 2012), #17 Exhibit P - Hann, et al., The Value of Online Information Privacy: An Empirical Investigation (Oct. 2003), #18 Exhibit Q - Californias Reader Privacy Act Signed into Law, Electronic Frontier Foundation (Oct. 3, 2011)) (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory A. Mitchell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank S. Hedin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer E Powell Miller