This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2020 at 12:25:41 (UTC).

Attorney General Ex Rel The People of the State of Michigan et al v. Mueller et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Attorney General Ex Rel The People of the State of Michigan filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Mueller. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green, Paul L. Maloney and Ray Kent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00520

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judges

Phillip J. Green

Ray Kent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Attorney General Ex Rel The People of the State of Michigan

Department of Natural Resources

Department of Environment, Great Lakes, and Energy

Attorney General Ex. Rel The People of the State of Michigan

Defendants

Stephen B. Hultberg

WD Boyce Trust 3650

Boyce Hydro Power, LLC

Edenville Hydro Property, LLC

WD Boyce Trust 2350

Lee W. Mueller

Boyce Hydro, LLC

Boyce Michigan, LLC

WD Boyce Trust 3649

Michele G. Mueller

Lee Mueller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan A. Gambill

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General

525 W. Ottawa, 5Th Fl.

Lansing, MI 48909

Danielle Allison-Yokom

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (ENRA-Lansing)

P.O. Box 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron M. Phelps

Attorney at Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett LLP (Grand Rapids)

333 Bridge St., Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

Lawrence A. Kogan

Attorney at The Kogan Law Group, P.C.

100 United Nations Plz., Ste. 14F

New York, NY 10017

Seth B. Arthur

Attorney at Varnum LLP

333 Bridge St., Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Exhibit

17 #10

Exhibit Ex. A-9

17 #9

Exhibit Ex. A-8

17 #8

Exhibit Ex. A-7

17 #7

Exhibit Ex. A-6

17 #6

Exhibit Ex. A-5

17 #5

Exhibit Ex. A-4

17 #4

Exhibit Ex. A-3

17 #3

Exhibit Ex. A-2

#6

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B Hultberg, Lee W. Mueller, Michele G Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , Notice of Removal,, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/06/2020)

#5

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B Hultberg, Lee W. Mueller, Michele G Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , Notice of Removal,, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/06/2020)

#4

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B Hultberg, Lee W. Mueller, Michele G Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , Notice of Removal,, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/06/2020)

#3

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B Hultberg, Lee W. Mueller, Michele G Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , Notice of Removal,, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/06/2020)

#2

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B Hultberg, Lee W. Mueller, Michele G Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , Notice of Removal,, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/06/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C - EGLE-MDNR Admin Warrant & Affidavits

1 #2

Exhibit B - KLG Boyce Response to USFWS Ltr

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B Hultberg, Lee W. Mueller, Michele G Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , Notice of Removal,, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/06/2020)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE re #17 of Additional Authority by defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B. Hultberg, Lee Mueller, Michele G. Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kogan, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record and Automatic Stay by defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B. Hultberg, Lee Mueller, Michele G. Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE TO MOTION to remand #15 filed by Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B. Hultberg, Lee Mueller, Michele G. Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List/Index, #2 Exhibit Ex. A-1, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-2, #4 Exhibit Ex. A-3, #5 Exhibit Ex. A-4, #6 Exhibit Ex. A-5, #7 Exhibit Ex. A-6, #8 Exhibit Ex. A-7, #9 Exhibit Ex. A-8, #10 Exhibit Ex. A-9, #11 Exhibit Ex. A-10, #12 Exhibit Ex. A-11, #13 Exhibit Ex. A-12, #14 Exhibit Ex. A-13, #15 Exhibit Ex. A-14, #16 Exhibit Ex. A-15, #17 Exhibit Ex. A-16, #18 Exhibit Ex. A-17, #19 Exhibit Ex. A-18, #20 Exhibit Ex. A-19, #21 Exhibit Ex. A-20, #22 Exhibit Ex. A-21, #23 Exhibit Ex. A-22, #24 Exhibit Ex. A-23, #25 Exhibit Ex. A-24) (Kogan, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Danielle Allison-Yokom on behalf of plaintiffs Attorney General Ex. Rel The People of the State of Michigan, Department of Environment, Great Lakes, and Energy, Department of Natural Resources (Allison-Yokom, Danielle) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BRIEF in support of MOTION to remand #15 filed by Attorney General Ex. Rel The People of the State of Michigan, Department of Environment, Great Lakes, and Energy, Department of Natural Resources (Gambill, Nathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to remand by plaintiffs Attorney General Ex. Rel The People of the State of Michigan, Department of Environment, Great Lakes, and Energy, Department of Natural Resources; (Gambill, Nathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Seth B. Arthur on behalf of defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B. Hultberg, Lee Mueller, Michele G. Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 (Arthur, Seth) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B. Hultberg, Lee Mueller, Michele G. Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lawrence A. Kogan on behalf of defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B. Hultberg, Lee Mueller, Michele G. Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 (Kogan, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B Hultberg, Lee W. Mueller, Michele G Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , Notice of Removal,, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WD Boyce Trust 3650 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WD Boyce Trust 3649 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WD Boyce Trust 2350 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Edenville Hydro Property, LLC (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boyce Michigan, LLC (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boyce Hydro, LLC (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boyce Hydro Power, LLC (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Boyce Michigan, LLC, Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, Stephen B Hultberg, Lee W. Mueller, Michele G Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 2350, WD Boyce Trust 3649, WD Boyce Trust 3650 in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5321733 (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan from State of Michigan - 30th Judicial Circuit Court case number 20-255-CE filed by Edenville Hydro Property, LLC, WD Boyce Trust 3650, Boyce Hydro Power, LLC, WD Boyce Trust 2350, Stephen B Hultberg, Boyce Hydro, LLC, Lee W. Mueller, WD Boyce Trust 3649, Michele G Mueller, Boyce Michigan, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - KLG Boyce Response to USFWS Ltr, #3 Exhibit C - EGLE-MDNR Admin Warrant & Affidavits) (Phelps, Aaron) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WD Boyce Trust 2350 is a litigant

Latest cases where Boyce Michigan, LLC is a litigant