This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 20:23:12 (UTC).

AT&T Mobility Services, LLC v. Boyd

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 AT T Mobility Services, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Boyd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02539

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AT&T Mobility Services, LLC

Defendant

Robert Boyd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Ryder Wentz

Attorney at Littler Mendelson - Cleveland

20Th Floor, 1100 Superior Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Jennifer B. Orr

Attorney at Littler Mendelson - Cleveland

20Th Floor, 1100 Superior Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Kenneth W. Gage

Attorney at Paul Hastings - Chicago

45Th Floor, 71 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Alanna B. Klein Fischer

Attorney at Caryn Groedel - Cleveland

31340 Solon Road

Cleveland, OH 44139

Cynthia L. Sands

Attorney at Law Office of Caryn M. Groedel

31340 Solon Road

Solon, OH 44139

Caryn M. Groedel

Attorney at Law Office of Caryn M. Groedel

31340 Solon Road

Solon, OH 44139

Matthew S. Grimsley

Attorney at Law Office of Caryn M. Groedel

31340 Solon Road

Solon, OH 44139

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Attorney Appearance by Caryn Groedel filed by on behalf of Robert Boyd. (Groedel, Caryn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#13

(#13) Reply in support of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Gage, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#12

(#12) Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Robert Boyd. (Groedel, Caryn) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

#11

(#11) Unopposed Motion for extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction until 12-6-19 ,filed by Plaintiff AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Orr, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

10 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Robert Boyd In Support of Defendant's Opposition t

#10

(#10) Opposition to #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction of State Court Action filed by Robert Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Boyd In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction)(Groedel, Caryn) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

3 #1

Brief in Support

#3

(#3) Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G - Declaration of Amy Ryder Wentz

1 #6

Exhibit F - Declaration of Jeff Nahlik

1 #5

Exhibit E - Declaration of Jeremy Dunlap

1 #4

Exhibit D - Declaration of Gerald W. Cummings

1 #3

Exhibit C - Declaration of Brandy Giordano

1 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration of Deirdre L. Scott

1 #1

Exhibit A - Amended Complaint

#1

(#1) Complaint against Robert Boyd. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9601367. Filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Deirdre L. Scott, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Brandy Giordano, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Gerald W. Cummings, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jeremy Dunlap, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Jeff Nahlik, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Amy Ryder Wentz, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons) (Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Attorney Appearance by Caryn Groedel filed by on behalf of Robert Boyd. (Groedel, Caryn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Reply in support of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Gage, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Robert Boyd. (Groedel, Caryn) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] granting #11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for extension of Reply Brief until 12-6-19 in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/25/2019.(L,Ja) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed Motion for extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction until 12-6-19 ,filed by Plaintiff AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Orr, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Opposition to #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction of State Court Action filed by Robert Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Boyd In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction)(Groedel, Caryn) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return of Service by regular mail and by email executed upon Robert Boyd on 11/7/2019, filed on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services, LLC Related document(s) #1 . (Orr, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Attorney Appearance by Jennifer B. Orr filed by on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Orr, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff AT&T Mobility Services, LLC's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kenneth W. Gage for AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/8/2019.(L,Ja) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Motion for attorney Kenneth W. Gage to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9618242, filed by Plaintiff AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kenneth W. Gage, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Robert Boyd. Summons sent out 10/30 were blank. (Y,A) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Robert Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Order filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. Related document(s) #3 . (Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Other Affiliate New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Other Affiliate AT&T Inc., Other Affiliate Leap Wireless International, Inc., Other Affiliate Cricket Holdco Inc., Other Affiliate LWI Holdco, Inc., Other Affiliate AT&T NCWS Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate SBC Telecom, Inc., Other Affiliate BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc. for AT&T Mobility Services, LLC filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint against Robert Boyd. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9601367. Filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Deirdre L. Scott, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Brandy Giordano, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Gerald W. Cummings, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jeremy Dunlap, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Jeff Nahlik, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Amy Ryder Wentz, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons) (Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less