This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 06:36:15 (UTC).

AT&T Corp. v. Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 AT T Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00466

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AT&T Corp.

Defendants

Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC

Acilis Telecom Holdings, LLC

Acilis Telecom Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Danielle K. Hatchitt

Attorney at Weisbart Springer Hayes LLP

212 Lavaca Street, Suite 200

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16027220). No Summons requested at this time, filed by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Corp. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Corp.. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AT&T Corp.. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/13/2022 to flatten image) (dl). (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC. (dl) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AT&T Corp.. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC. (dm) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AT&T Corp.. Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC served on 5/20/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AT&T Corp.. Acilis Telecom Management, LLC served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AT&T Corp.. Acilis Telecom Holdings, LLC served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC, Acilis Telecom Holdings, LLC, Acilis Telecom Management, LLC.(dm) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC, Acilis Telecom Holdings, LLC, Acilis Telecom Management, LLC.(dm) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AT&T Corp.. Acilis Telecom Holdings, LLC served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AT&T Corp.. Acilis Telecom Management, LLC served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AT&T Corp.. Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC served on 5/20/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC. (dm) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AT&T Corp.. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Acilis Backbone Technologies, LLC. (dl) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (dl) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AT&T Corp.. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/13/2022 to flatten image) (dl). (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Corp. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Corp.. (Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16027220). No Summons requested at this time, filed by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hatchitt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant