This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2020 at 08:19:22 (UTC).

ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03617

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS

MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL

RMC ANNISTON

MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN

GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER

UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

MCLAREN LAPEER REGION

GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL

MCLAREN MACOMB

MCLAREN BAY REGION

MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL

AULTMAN HOSPITAL

UNION HOSPITAL

NORTHWESTERN KISHWAUKEE HOSPITAL

MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL

NORTH KANSAS CITY HOSPITAL

ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER

GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES

PORT HURON HOSPITAL

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

N. Kent Smith

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEALTH & LYMAN, P.C.

500 North Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1293

 

Court Documents

8 #2

Exhibit USPS Tracking

8 #1

Exhibit Certified Green Card

#8

7 #2

Exhibit USPS Tracking

7 #1

Exhibit Certified Green Card

#7

6 #2

Exhibit USPS Tracking

6 #1

Exhibit Certified Green Card

#6

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Summons to William Barr

1 #3

Summons to Jessie Liu

1 #2

Summons to Alex Azar

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/27/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Green Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Green Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 1/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Green Card, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, N.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:19-MC-00190-ABJ. (Smith, N.) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY WESTVIEW HOSPITAL, FREEMAN WEST, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, MCLAREN BAY REGION, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NORTH KANSAS CITY HOSPITAL, NORTHWESTERN KISHWAUKEE HOSPITAL, PORT HURON HOSPITAL, RMC ANNISTON, UNION HOSPITAL, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Smith, N.) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by N. Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, N.) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT UNDER THE MEDICARE ACT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6612104) filed by GWINNETT MEDICAL CENTER - LAWRENCEVILLE, NORTH KANSAS CITY HOSPITAL, FREEMAN WEST, UPPER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN MACOMB, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, NORTHWESTERN KISHWAUKEE HOSPITAL, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, PORT HURON HOSPITAL, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, UNION HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY WESTVIEW HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, MIZELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MCLAREN BAY REGION, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, RMC ANNISTON, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, GREAT RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex Azar, #3 Summons to Jessie Liu, #4 Summons to William Barr)(Smith, N.) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases where UNION HOSPITAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Marin General Hospital is a litigant