This case was last updated from PACER on 01/09/2021 at 09:45:43 (UTC).

ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC. et al v. FUENTES et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC filed an Other lawsuit against FUENTES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01719

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC

ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC.

HVL LLC doing business as DOUGLAS LABORATORIES

Defendants

PABLO FUENTES

JOHN DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Martha Brewer Motley

Attorney at Vorys Sayer Seymour & Pease LLP

52 E Gay Street, P.O. Box 1008

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

Mark C. Zheng

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease LLP

500 Grant Street, Suite 4900

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/7/21. (dcd) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#14

(#14) BRIEF in Support re #13 Motion for Default Judgment, Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC, PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC. (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION for Default Judgment against PABLO FUENTES , MOTION for Permanent Injunction by PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC, ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#12

(#12) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to PABLO FUENTES (jd) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Martha Brewer Motley

#11

(#11) REQUEST by PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC, ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC for entry of DEFAULT against PABLO FUENTES . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Martha Brewer Motley) (Motley, Martha) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC, ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC. PABLO FUENTES served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. (Motley, Martha) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Alternative Service of Process. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/25/20. (dcd) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit A to Motley Declaration

8 #1

Exhibit Motley Declaration

#8

(#8) BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion for Service by Publication Alternative Service of Process by Email and Amazon Message filed by ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC, PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motley Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Motley Declaration) (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Service by Publication Alternative Service of Process by Email and Amazon Message by ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC, PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons/Return of Service Returned Unexecuted by PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC, ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC as to PABLO FUENTES. (Motley, Martha) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/13/20. (jhi) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying Nestle S.A. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC, PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC. (Motley, Martha) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#17) JUDGMENT ORDER. FINAL JUDGMENT hereby is entered pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case has been marked closed. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/7/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/7/21. (dcd) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. #13 ) will be granted. Damages are not requested, so a hearing is not required. Having carefully reviewed Plaintiffs' filings, the Court is satisfied that it has subject matter jurisdiction, and personal jurisdiction over Defendant Pablo Fuentes; that the Chamberlain factors favor entry of default judgment; and that Defendants have demonstrated entitlement to the entry of a permanent injunction (including the four factors applicable for all injunctions, i.e., likelihood of success on the merits, et cetera). Finally, the Court has considered Defendants' proposed order of injunction, and finds it to be appropriate. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Motion (Doc. #13 ) is GRANTED, and the Court will enter contemporaneously herewith the (proposed) injunction order and a Rule 58 Judgment. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/7/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEF in Support re #13 Motion for Default Judgment, Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC, PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC. (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Default Judgment against PABLO FUENTES , MOTION for Permanent Injunction by PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC, ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to PABLO FUENTES (jd) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST by PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC, ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC for entry of DEFAULT against PABLO FUENTES . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Martha Brewer Motley) (Motley, Martha) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC, ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC. PABLO FUENTES served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. (Motley, Martha) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Alternative Service of Process. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/25/20. (dcd) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion for Service by Publication Alternative Service of Process by Email and Amazon Message filed by ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC, PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motley Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Motley Declaration) (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Service by Publication Alternative Service of Process by Email and Amazon Message by ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC, PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons/Return of Service Returned Unexecuted by PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC, ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC as to PABLO FUENTES. (Motley, Martha) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/13/20. (jhi) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying Nestle S.A. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ATRIUM INNOVATIONS INC., HVL LLC, PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC. (Motley, Martha) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 11/20/2020. (jd) Modified on 11/24/2020 (jd). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to PABLO FUENTES (jd) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PURE ENCAPSULATIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark C. Zheng

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martha Brewer Motley