Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 15:32:07 (UTC).

AtriCure, Inc. v. Meng et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 AtriCure, Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Meng. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael R. Barrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00054

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Barrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AtriCure, Inc.

Defendants

Dr. Jian Meng

Dr. Guanglu Bai

Larry Meng

Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd

Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd doing business as Med-Zenith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Alan Chesley

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

203 North Lasalle Street, Suite 1900

Chicago, IL 60601

Cameron A. Fine

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2525 East Camelback Road, Suite 1000

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Mark A Nadeau

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

2525 East Camelback Road, Suite 1000

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel John Donnellon

Attorney at SEBALY SHILLITO DYER

9100 West Chester Towne Centre Drive, Suite 210

West Chester, OH 45069

Geoffrey R. Sant

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

Mark R. Hellerer

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

Brian L. Beckerman

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

22 #2

Exhibit B

22 #1

Exhibit A

#22

(#22) Memorandum Supporting #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Donnellon, Daniel) Modified to clarify docket text on 3/22/2019 (jlw). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey R. Sant for Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd and Jian Meng. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/20/19. (ba) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

19 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

19 #1

Exhibit Good Standing Cert.

#19

(#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6839389) of Geoffrey R. Sant by Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Cert., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

1 #11

Summons Form Bai Summons Form

1 #10

Summons Form Meng China Summons Form

1 #9

Summons Form Meng Summons Form

1 #6

Exhibit Complaint Ex 6

1 #5

Exhibit Complaint Ex 5

1 #4

Exhibit Complaint Ex 4

1 #3

Exhibit Complaint Ex 3

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint Ex 2

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint Ex 1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Memorandum Supporting #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Donnellon, Daniel) Modified to clarify docket text on 3/22/2019 (jlw). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey R. Sant for Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd and Jian Meng. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/20/19. (ba) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6839389) of Geoffrey R. Sant by Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Cert., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark Hellerer for Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/8/19. (ba) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian Beckerman for Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/8/19. (ba) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6826250) of Mark Hellerer by Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Cert., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6825762) of Brian Beckerman by Defendants Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Cert., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; Meng and Beijing Medical Scientific Co., Ltd, due 3/21/19. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/20/19. (ba) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6786497) of Cameron A. Fine by Plaintiff AtriCure, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cameron Fine, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Chesley, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6786462) of Mark A. Nadeau by Plaintiff AtriCure, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark Nadeau, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Chesley, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd. Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd served on 1/26/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Chesley, Richard) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Jian Meng. Jian Meng served on 1/26/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Chesley, Richard) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd. on 01/26/2019, filed by Plaintiff AtriCure, Inc.. (Chesley, Richard) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Dr. Jian "Larry" Meng on 01/26/2019, filed by Plaintiff AtriCure, Inc.. (Chesley, Richard) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Guanglu Bai, Beijing Medical Scientific Co. Ltd, Jian Meng. (sct) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (sct) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff AtriCure, Inc.. (Chesley, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6761032), filed by AtriCure, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Complaint Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Complaint Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Complaint Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Complaint Ex 5, #6 Exhibit Complaint Ex 6, #7 Exhibit Complaint Ex 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Form Meng Summons Form, #10 Summons Form Meng China Summons Form, #11 Summons Form Bai Summons Form, #12 Summons Form Beijing Medical Summons Form) (Chesley, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATRICURE, INC. is a litigant