This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:30:16 (UTC).

Atlas Global Technologies LLC v. TP-Link Technologies Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Atlas Global Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against TP-Link Technologies Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00430

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atlas Global Technologies LLC

Defendants

TP-Link Technologies Co., Ltd.

TP-Link Corporation Ltd

TP-Link International Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alden Harris

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Blaine Andrew Larson

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Eric James Enger

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

William Brown Collier, Jr

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush, LLP - Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Michael F Heim

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush, LLP - Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Max Lalon Tribble, Jr

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Joseph Samuel Grinstein

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Kalpana Srinivasan

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP - Los Angeles

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Thomas John Ward, Jr

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Summons(es) TP-Link Technologies Co., Ltd.

16 #1

Summons(es) TP-Link International Ltd.

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Issued as to TP-Link Corporation Ltd. c/o TP-Link USA Corporation DEYI SHU (Registered Agent, CFO, and Secretary), TP-Link International Ltd. c/o TP-Link USA Corporation DEYI SHU (Registered Agent, CFO, and Secretary), TP-Link Technologies Co., Ltd. c/o TP-Link USA Corporation DEYI SHU (Registered Agent, CFO, and Secretary). (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) TP-Link International Ltd., #2 Summons(es) TP-Link Technologies Co., Ltd.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kalpana Srinivasan on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max Lalon Tribble, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#10

(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Collier, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atlas Global Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Other Affiliate Acacia Research Group for Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Collier, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Collier, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Brown Collier, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Collier, William) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Harris, Alden) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Issued as to TP-Link Corporation Ltd. c/o TP-Link USA Corporation DEYI SHU (Registered Agent, CFO, and Secretary), TP-Link International Ltd. c/o TP-Link USA Corporation DEYI SHU (Registered Agent, CFO, and Secretary), TP-Link Technologies Co., Ltd. c/o TP-Link USA Corporation DEYI SHU (Registered Agent, CFO, and Secretary). (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) TP-Link International Ltd., #2 Summons(es) TP-Link Technologies Co., Ltd.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kalpana Srinivasan on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max Lalon Tribble, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Collier, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atlas Global Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Other Affiliate Acacia Research Group for Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Collier, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Collier, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Brown Collier, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Collier, William) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Harris, Alden) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Atlas Global Technologies LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8683335.), filed by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Heim, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlas Global Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TP-Link USA Corporation d/b/a TP-Link North America Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TP-LINK Technology Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alden Harris