This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2021 at 07:45:12 (UTC).

Atlas Global Technologies LLC v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On August 9, 2021, Atlas Global Technologies LLC (“Atlas” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Alden G. Harris, Blaine A. Larson, Eric James Enger, Michael F. Heim and William B. Collier, Jr. of Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP and Elizabeth L. DeRieux and S. Calvin Capshaw, III of Capshaw DeRieux, LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., (“SEC”) and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (“SEA”) (collectively, “Samsung” or “Defendants”), seeking damages, enhanced damages and royalties, among other reliefs, for the alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding.

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent No. 9,763,259 (“the ’259 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,825,738 (“the ’738 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,848,442 (“the ’442 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,912,513 (“the ’513 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,917,679 (“the ’679 Patent”), United States Patent No. 10,020,919 (“the ’919 Patent”), United States Patent No.10,153,886 (“the ’886 Patent”) and United States Patent No. 10,756,851 (“the ’851 Patent”) (collectively, the “Asserted Patents” or “Patents-in-suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Samsung directly infringes the ’259 Patent under 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) by making, using, selling, and/or offering to sell in the United States, and/or importing into the United States products that directly infringe the ’259 Patent, including the above identified Accused Products. The Accused Products infringe at least claim 1 of the ’259 Patent by practicing the 802.11ax Standard.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “In addition to directly infringing the ’259 method claims by using infringing products in the United States, Samsung also indirectly infringes the ’259 claims. Where acts constituting direct infringement of the ’259 Patent are not performed by Samsung, such acts constituting direct infringement of the ’259 Patent are performed by Samsung’s customers or end-users who act at the direction and/or control of Samsung, with Samsung’s knowledge.”

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Atlas is informed and believes, and on that basis alleges, that Samsung indirectly infringes at least claim 1 of the ’259 Patent by active inducement in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(b), by at least manufacturing, supplying, distributing, selling, and/or offering for sale the Accused Products to their customers with the knowledge and intent that use of those products would constitute direct infringement of the ’259 Patent.”

Similar allegations have been made by the Plaintiff with reference to the alleged infringement of other Patents-in-suit. 

There are eight claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the alleged infringement of each of the Patents-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for declaratory reliefs; an accounting of all damages sustained by Plaintiff as the result of Samsung’s acts of infringement; for a mandatory future royalty payable on each and every future sale by Samsung of a product that is found to infringe one or more of the Asserted Patents and on all future products that are not colorably different from products found to infringe; to find that Samsung’s infringement is willful and enhancing damages pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284 including attorneys’ fees and costs of suit as well as any other relief the Court deems just.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00304

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atlas Global Technologies LLC

Defendants

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alden Harris

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Blaine Andrew Larson

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Eric James Enger

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Max Lalon Tribble, Jr

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Joseph Samuel Grinstein

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Kalpana Srinivasan

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP - Los Angeles

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

William Brown Collier, Jr

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush, LLP - Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Michael F Heim

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush, LLP - Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

11 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kalpana Srinivasan on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atlas Global Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Other Affiliate Acacia Research Group for Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max Lalon Tribble, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Brown Collier, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Collier, William) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Harris, Alden) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8527753.), filed by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Heim, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlas Global Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alden Harris