This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2022 at 18:05:21 (UTC).

Atlas Global Technologies LLC v. ASUSTeK Computer Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 Atlas Global Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ASUSTeK Computer Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00820

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atlas Global Technologies LLC

Defendant

ASUSTeK Computer Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alejandra C. Salinas

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Blaine A. Larson

Attorney at Heim Payne and Chorush LLP

600 Travis, Suite 6710

Houston, TX 77002

Eric James Enger

Attorney at Heim, Payne Chorush, LLP

1111 Bagby St., Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Joseph S. Grinstein

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Kalpana Srinivasan

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6029

Max L. Tribble, Jr.

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Michael F. Heim

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush LLP

1111 Bagby St., Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Elizabeth L. DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux, L.L.P.

114 E. Commerce Ave.

Gladewater, TX 75647

Oleg Elkhunovich

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

S. Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

114 E. Commerce Ave.

Gladewater, TX 75647

T. John Ward, Jr.

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

P.O. Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

William Brown Collier, Jr.

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP

1111 Bagby St., Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Alden G. Harris

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Andrea L. Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ATTACHMENT Corrected Proposed Order to #28 MOTION for Service of Process by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Salinas, Alejandra) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#29

(#29) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #28 MOTION for Service of Process. Pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Proceedings Dated 10/8/2021. The proposed Order shall omit the word Proposed from the title. Resubmit the Proposed Order using the Attachment event and link back to Motion. (ir) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

28 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order

28 #1

Exhibit 1

#28

(#28) MOTION for Service of Process by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Salinas, Alejandra) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

27 #1

CM receipt

#27

(#27) ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. 2 certified originals sent to requesting atty via USPS CM#70081830000460366778. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2021: #1 CM receipt) (lad). Originals exemplified x2 and returned via FedEx 791210679239 on 12/13/2021 (lad). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

25 #1

Proposed Order Letter Rogatory

#25

(#25) MOTION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Letter Rogatory)(Salinas, Alejandra) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ATTACHMENT Corrected Proposed Order to #28 MOTION for Service of Process by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Salinas, Alejandra) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #28 MOTION for Service of Process. Pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Proceedings Dated 10/8/2021. The proposed Order shall omit the word Proposed from the title. Resubmit the Proposed Order using the Attachment event and link back to Motion. (ir) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION for Service of Process by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Salinas, Alejandra) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. 2 certified originals sent to requesting atty via USPS CM#70081830000460366778. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2021: #1 CM receipt) (lad). Originals exemplified x2 and returned via FedEx 791210679239 on 12/13/2021 (lad). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER Withdrawing Text Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***WITHDRAWN PER #26 *** Text Order DENYING #25 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. This method of foreign service is improper. Plaintiff is directed to contact the Clerk's office for information on the proper methods of foreign service. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (WMlc) Modified on 10/28/2021 (lad). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Letter Rogatory)(Salinas, Alejandra) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Summons Issued as to ASUSTeK Computer Inc. (ir) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L. DeRieux on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC. Attorney Elizabeth L. DeRieux added to party Atlas Global Technologies LLC(pty:pla) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S. Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC. Attorney S. Calvin Capshaw, III added to party Atlas Global Technologies LLC(pty:pla) (Capshaw, S.) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine A. Larson on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden G. Harris on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Harris, Alden) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (Main document: Letter to Oleg Elkhunovich, Attachments: #1 Letter to William B. Collier, Jr.)(lad) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15096686). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Heim, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlas Global Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Asustek Computer Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oleg Elkhunovich