This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 08:38:49 (UTC).

Atlas Global Technologies LLC v. Acer Incorporated

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Atlas Global Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Acer Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy S. Payne and Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00259

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atlas Global Technologies LLC

Defendant

Acer Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alejandra Christina Salinas

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Max Lalon Tribble, Jr

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Alden Harris

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Blaine Andrew Larson

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Eric James Enger

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Michael F Heim

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush, LLP - Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Johnny Ward, Jr

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Joseph Samuel Grinstein

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Kalpana Srinivasan

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP - Los Angeles

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

William Brown Collier, Jr

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush, LLP - Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alejandra Christina Salinas on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Salinas, Alejandra) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max Lalon Tribble, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kalpana Srinivasan on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Johnny Ward, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Ward, Johnny) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atlas Global Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Other Affiliate Acacia Research Group LLC for Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Collier, William) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#7

(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Collier, William) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Collier, William) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Harris, Alden) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Brown Collier, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Collier, William) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit A

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alejandra Christina Salinas on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Salinas, Alejandra) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max Lalon Tribble, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kalpana Srinivasan on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Johnny Ward, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Ward, Johnny) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atlas Global Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Other Affiliate Acacia Research Group LLC for Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Collier, William) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Collier, William) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Collier, William) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Harris, Alden) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Brown Collier, Jr on behalf of Atlas Global Technologies LLC (Collier, William) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Acer Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9017311.), filed by Atlas Global Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Heim, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlas Global Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Acer Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johnny Ward, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alden Harris