This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2021 at 08:20:53 (UTC).

Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company v. Returns 'R' Us, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Returns 'R' Us, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05619

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Returns 'R' Us, Inc. d/b/a Pharma Logistics

Juan Rodriguez

Damian Castro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael John Duffy

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP

55 West Monroe Streetsuite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

Greta Ayn Matzen

Attorney at Intact Insurance Specialty Solutions

188 Inverness Dr. Westste 600

Engelwood, CO 80112

Alan M. Posner

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

55 West Monroe Streetsuite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603-5001

Joyce S. Min

Attorney at Intact U.S. Coverage Litigation Group

44 Whippany Road

Morristown, NJ 07960

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

#2

#3

#4

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company by Greta Ayn Matzen (Matzen, Greta) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 1/11/2021 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company by Alan M. Posner (Posner, Alan) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Duffy, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18923680. (Min, Joyce) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion by counsel to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. For docket clarification purposes, the telephonic initial status hearing is set for 1/11/2022 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion by counsel to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. For docket clarification purposes, the telephonic initial status hearing is set for 1/11/2022 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Returns 'R' Us, Inc. d/b/a Pharma Logistics (cxr, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18923680. (Min, Joyce) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Duffy, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company by Alan M. Posner (Posner, Alan) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Returns 'R' Us, Inc. d/b/a Pharma Logistics (cm, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 1/11/2021 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company by Greta Ayn Matzen (Matzen, Greta) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (Duffy, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company by Michael John Duffy (Duffy, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Duffy, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18794311. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Duffy, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan M. Posner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greta Ayn Matzen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael John Duffy