This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/23/2022 at 06:23:15 (UTC).

Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company et al v. Apex Logistics International Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Apex Logistics International Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05277

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company

Federal Insurance Company

Indemnity Insurance Company of North America

Intact Insurance Company

Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Apex Logistics International Inc.

UPS Asia Group Pte. Ltd.

Topocean Consolidation Service (Los Angeles) Inc.

Tianshi Logistics Co., Ltd

Trans Knights Inc.

Does One through Ten

3Rd Party Defendants

Yang Ming Marine Transport Corporation

Yang Ming (America) Corporation

Ocean Network Express Pte., Ltd. ONE

Ocean Network Express (North America), Inc.

Roes 1-10

Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft a/k/a Hapag-Lloyd AG

Ocean Network Express Pte. Ltd.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Cummins

Attorney at Gibson & Robb

275 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joshua A. Southwick

Attorney at Gibson Robb & Lindh LLP

100 First Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Danielle Cruz

Attorney at Flynn, Delich, and Wise LLP

One Worl Trade Center, Suite 1800

Longbeach, CA 90831-1800

Alisa Manasantivongs

Attorney at Flynn, Delich and Wise, LLP

One World Trade Center, Suite 1800

Long Beach, CA 90831

Erich P. Wise

Attorney at Flynn, Delich & Wise

1 World Trade Ctr.

Long Beach, CA 90831-1800

Lisa M Conner

Attorney at Flynn Delich and Wise LLP

One World Trade Center Suite 1800

Long Beach, CA 90831

Michael S. McDaniel

Attorney at Countryman & McDaniel

5933 West Century Boulevard, Suite 1111

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Mark P. Estrella

Attorney at Countryman and McDaniel LLP

5901 West Century Boulevard, Suite 1250

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Owen F. Duffy

Attorney at Law Offices of Owen F. Duffy

56 Garden City Avenue

Point Lookout, NY 99999

John B Buda

Attorney at John Buda Law Offices

1201 West Huntington Drive Suite 209

Arcadia, CA 91007

 

Court Documents

76 #1

*Restricted*

76 #76

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#75

(#75) Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3028, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Paul A. Engelmayer. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

74 #1

Exhibit A

74 #74

Main Document

#73

(#73) MINUTE ORDER STAYING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Having reviewed the joint status report on the pending multidistrict litigation (MDL) motion to transfer #71 , the Court STAYS the case management order for an additional 60 days, up to and including 7/30/2022. The parties are to provide a joint status report on 7/21/2022, or within seven days of a ruling on the pending MDL motion to transfer, whichever is sooner. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#72

No Description Available

#71

(#73) MINUTE ORDER STAYING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Having reviewed the joint status report on the pending multidistrict litigation (MDL) motion to transfer #71 , the Court STAYS the case management order for an additional 60 days, up to and including 7/30/2022. The parties are to provide a joint status report on 7/21/2022, or within seven days of a ruling on the pending MDL motion to transfer, whichever is sooner. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/01/2022)

70 #2

Proposed Order

70 #1

Memorandum in Support of Application

70 #70

Main Document

#69

No Description Available

68 #2

Proposed Order

68 #1

Declaration

68 #68

Main Document

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE.. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:21-cv-08974. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3028, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Paul A. Engelmayer. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) JOINT REPORT of RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO ORDER IN MDL 3028 AND REQUEST TO VACATE FUTURE DATES filed by Plaintiffs Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) MINUTE ORDER STAYING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Having reviewed the joint status report on the pending multidistrict litigation (MDL) motion to transfer #71 , the Court STAYS the case management order for an additional 60 days, up to and including 7/30/2022. The parties are to provide a joint status report on 7/21/2022, or within seven days of a ruling on the pending MDL motion to transfer, whichever is sooner. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua A Southwick counsel for Plaintiffs Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.. Adding JOSHUA A. SOUTHWICK as counsel of record for Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Federal Insurance Company, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Federal Insurance Company, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd. (Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Indemnity Insurance Company of North America(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Intact Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.(pty:pla))(Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE/ NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd., identifying Chubb INA Holdings as the Parent company of Federal Insurance Company; Chubb Group Holdings as the Parent of Chubb INA Holdings; Chubb Limited as the Parent of Chubb Group Holdings; Intact Insurance Group USA Holdings, Inc. as the Parent of Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company; Intact Financial Corporation as the Parent of Intact Insurance Group USA Holdings, Inc.. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Taian Insurance Co. Ltd. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Intact Insurance Company identifying Intact Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Indemnity Insurance Company of North America identifying Chubb Limited as Corporate Parent. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company identifying Chubb INA Holdings Inc, Chubb Group Holdings Inc, and Chubb Limited as Corporate Parent. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company identifying Intact Insurance Group USA Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.. (Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32331311 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Federal Insurance Company, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Intact Insurance Company, Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.. (Attorney Michael J Cummins added to party Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J Cummins added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J Cummins added to party Indemnity Insurance Company of North America(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J Cummins added to party Intact Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J Cummins added to party Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.(pty:pla))(Cummins, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Taian Insurance Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Intact Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Yang Ming (America) Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp is a litigant