This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 10:47:44 (UTC).

Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company v. J&F Construction, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against J F Construction, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa L Springmann and Andrew P Rodovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

Referral Judge

Andrew P Rodovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants

Sophia Suleiman

J&F Construction, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis M Dolan

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP - Chi/IL

303 W Madison St Ste 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Phillip G Litchfield

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP - Chi/IL

303 W Madison St Ste 300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Litchfield, Phillip) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis M Dolan on behalf of Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit A - Redacted

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT REDACTED against J&F Construction, LLC, Sophia Suleiman, filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted)(Dolan, Dennis) Modified on 3/18/2021 to edit docket text (nae). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip G Litchfield on behalf of Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company (Litchfield, Phillip) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER: The court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to permanently place under SEAL from public view (but not from the parties or the court) the Complaint #1 and Exhibit A attached to the complaint. The court ORDERS the plaintiff, Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company, to file a redacted version of the Complaint and Exhibit A. The court further ORDERS that all future filings must use the minor's initials in both the caption and throughout the document and that any exhibits containing the minor's full name must be redacted before being filed on the electronic docket. The parties are WARNED that a future failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) will result in the court striking the filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/16/21. (ksp) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Insurance Policy

1 #1

Exhibit A- Third-Party Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against J&F Construction, LLC and Sophia Suleiman. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0755-4511249) filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Third-Party Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Dolan, Dennis) Note: Documents restricted per Order DE #2. Modified on 3/16/2021 to edit text (ksp). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Litchfield, Phillip) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis M Dolan on behalf of Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT REDACTED against J&F Construction, LLC, Sophia Suleiman, filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted)(Dolan, Dennis) Modified on 3/18/2021 to edit docket text (nae). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip G Litchfield on behalf of Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company (Litchfield, Phillip) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: The court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to permanently place under SEAL from public view (but not from the parties or the court) the Complaint #1 and Exhibit A attached to the complaint. The court ORDERS the plaintiff, Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company, to file a redacted version of the Complaint and Exhibit A. The court further ORDERS that all future filings must use the minor's initials in both the caption and throughout the document and that any exhibits containing the minor's full name must be redacted before being filed on the electronic docket. The parties are WARNED that a future failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) will result in the court striking the filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/16/21. (ksp) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketJudge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE. (nal) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against J&F Construction, LLC and Sophia Suleiman. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0755-4511249) filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Third-Party Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Dolan, Dennis) Note: Documents restricted per Order DE #2. Modified on 3/16/2021 to edit text (ksp). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip Glen Litchfield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis M. Dolan