This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 08:40:44 (UTC).

Atkinson v. Trinity Health Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Atkinson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Trinity Health Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Denise Page Hood and Kimberly G. Altman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-11284

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise Page Hood

Referral Judge

Kimberly G. Altman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kerresha Atkinson

Defendant

Trinity Health Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael N. Hanna

Matthew Scott Parmet

Defendant Attorneys

Robert William Pritchard

Saniya Khare

Sarah J. Miley

Sean P Dawson

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kerresha Atkinson against Trinity Health Corporation with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8942649 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Trinity Health Corporation* (DAll) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Consent

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael N. Hanna on behalf of Kerresha Atkinson. (Hanna, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kerresha Atkinson served on 6/15/2022, answer due 7/6/2022. (Hanna, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Saniya Khare on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation. (Khare, Saniya) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#7

(#7) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trinity Health Corporation (Khare, Saniya) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 , ( Response due by 8/4/2022). Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Pritchard on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation. (Pritchard, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Miley on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation. (Miley, Sarah) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P Dawson on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation. (Dawson, Sean) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Trinity Health Corporation. (Dawson, Sean) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Trinity Health Corporation. (Dawson, Sean) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P Dawson on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation. (Dawson, Sean) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Miley on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation. (Miley, Sarah) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Pritchard on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation. (Pritchard, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 , ( Response due by 8/4/2022). Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trinity Health Corporation (Khare, Saniya) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Saniya Khare on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation. (Khare, Saniya) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kerresha Atkinson served on 6/15/2022, answer due 7/6/2022. (Hanna, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael N. Hanna on behalf of Kerresha Atkinson. (Hanna, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE by Kerresha Atkinson of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent) (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Trinity Health Corporation* (DAll) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kerresha Atkinson against Trinity Health Corporation with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8942649 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less