Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/11/2021 at 16:50:28 (UTC).

Atkinson et al v. Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Atkinson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LaKeysha Greer Isaac and Carlton W. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michala Atkinson

Angela Atkinson

Defendant

Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J. Weldy

Attorney at WELDY LAW FIRM, PLLC

105 North College Street

Brandon, MS 39042

Defendant Attorney

Joseph W. Gill

Attorney at CURRIE, JOHNSON & MYERS, PA - Jackson

P. O. Box 750, 1044 River Oaks Drive (39232)

Jackson, MS 39205-0750

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#3

(#3) State Court Record by Defendant Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Volumes 1 of 1 (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

(#2) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012(Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Leake County, Mississippi, case number 21-32. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4528115) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) State Court Record by Defendant Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company Volumes 1 of 1 (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012(Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Leake County, Mississippi, case number 21-32. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4528115) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Walter Gill