Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2019 at 08:06:07 (UTC).

Atkinson #12325-040 v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Atkinson 12325-040 filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert J. Jonker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00709

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040

Pekin, IL 61555

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Davin Maitland Reust

Attorney at U.S. Attorney (Grand Rapids)

The Law Bldg., 330 Ionia Ave., Nw, P.O. Box 208

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0208

Ryan D. Cobb

Attorney at U.S. Attorney (Grand Rapids)

The Law Bldg., 330 Ionia Ave., Nw, P.O. Box 208

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0208

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER dismissing as moot #9 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

10 #1

Proposed Document

#10

(#10) MOTION to amend/correct #1 by movant Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (mg) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

9 #1

Financial Documents

#9

(#9) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mg) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 motion for order authorizing release of information subject to attorney-client privilege and extension of time to file response/reply ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply #5 filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Reust, Davin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply by respondent United States of America; (Reust, Davin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

4 #1

Response from Clerk

#4

(#4) LETTER from Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040 requesting forms; response from Clerk and form mailed 9/20/19. (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk) (mg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: the U.S. Attorney to answer the motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence within 60 days ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) filed by Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A-B) (mg) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER dismissing as moot #9 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to amend/correct #1 by movant Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (mg) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040 (mg) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mg) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for order titled as "Movants motion and request for leave for the production of documents" with certificate of service by movant Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040; (mg) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 motion for order authorizing release of information subject to attorney-client privilege and extension of time to file response/reply ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply #5 filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Reust, Davin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply by respondent United States of America; (Reust, Davin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040 requesting forms; response from Clerk and form mailed 9/20/19. (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk) (mg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Answer (2255) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040 (mg) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: the U.S. Attorney to answer the motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence within 60 days ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040 (mg) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of receipt of case (mg) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) filed by Christopher Scott Atkinson #12325-040 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A-B) (mg) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less