This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 15:29:11 (UTC).

ATIYEH

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 ATIYEH was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-02381

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Appellee

ANDREW R. VARA

Trustees

SCOTT F. WATERMAN

Reading, PA 19606

UNITED STATES TRUSTEE

Debtor In Possession

DENNIS J. ATIYEH

Schnecksville, PA 18078

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

ROBERT JOSEPH SCHNEIDER, JR.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE

One Newark Center Suite 2100

Newark, NJ 07102

Trustee Attorneys

SCOTT F. WATERMAN

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CHAPTER 13 STANDING TRUSTEE

2901 St.Lawrence Ave Suite 100

Reading, PA 19606

DAVE ADAMS

Attorney at U.S. DEPT OF JUSTICE

833 Chestnut St., Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

6 #14

Exhibit

6 #13

Exhibit

6 #12

Exhibit

6 #11

Exhibit

6 #10

Exhibit

6 #9

Exhibit

6 #8

Exhibit

6 #7

Exhibit

6 #6

Exhibit

6 #5

Exhibit

6 #4

Exhibit

6 #3

Exhibit

6 #2

Exhibit

6 #1

Exhibit

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT JOSEPH SCHNEIDER, JR on behalf of ANDREW R. VARA (SCHNEIDER, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Briefing Schedule. 6/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATIYEH AND EMAILED. (rf, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Supplemental Bankruptcy Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court RE:. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(rf, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT JOSEPH SCHNEIDER, JR on behalf of ANDREW R. VARA (SCHNEIDER, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Briefing Schedule. 6/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATIYEH AND EMAILED. (rf, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rf, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Certificate of Appeal of DENNIS J. ATIYEH from the order of Bankruptcy Judge PATRICIA M. MAYER filed on 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCKET)(bw, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant