This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2020 at 14:34:25 (UTC).

Atithi, LLC v. AmGUARD Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 Atithi, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AmGUARD Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00257

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atithi, LLC

5110 Main Street

Stevens Point, WI 54481

Defendant

AmGUARD Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Ray Graff

Attorney at Nash, Spindler, Grimstad & Mccracken

1425 Memorial Drive

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Sean Adam Bukowski

Attorney at Nash, Spindler, Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Drive

Manitowoc, WI 54220

John Francis Mayer

Attorney at Nash, Spindler, Grimstad & Mccracken

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant Attorney

Craig Jacobson

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

1 North Franklin, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Certificate of Service

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig Jacobson for Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Jacobson, Craig) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#10

(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. AmGUARD Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Graff, Ryan) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against AmGUARD Insurance Company, filed by Atithi, LLC. (Mayer, John) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Sean Adam Bukowski for Plaintiff Atithi, LLC. (Bukowski, Sean) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AmGUARD Insurance Company, filed by Atithi, LLC. (Graff, Ryan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Atithi, LLC (Graff, Ryan) Modified on 3/23/2020. (lak) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by John Francis Mayer for Plaintiff Atithi, LLC. (Mayer, John) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2648260) filed by Atithi, LLC. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Graff, Ryan) Modified on 3/20/2020: Deleted addresses of both parties. (lak) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig Jacobson for Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Jacobson, Craig) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. AmGUARD Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Graff, Ryan) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is satisfied that plaintiff Atithi, LLC's second amended complaint, Dkt. #8 , contains allegations sufficient to establish subject matter jurisdiction in compliance with the court's April 3, 2020 order, Dkt. 6. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/6/2020. (arw) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against AmGUARD Insurance Company, filed by Atithi, LLC. (Mayer, John) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Sean Adam Bukowski for Plaintiff Atithi, LLC. (Bukowski, Sean) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff Atithi, LLC has filed an amended complaint, Dkt. #5 , in response to the court's order regarding jurisdiction, Dkt. 4. The amended complaint sufficiently identifies Atithi's members, but it fails to allege information sufficient to determine those members' citizenship. Atithi gives the state of residency for each individual, but allegations of residency are not sufficient; citizenship is determined by domicile, which is where the party intends to live long term. Myrick v. WellPoint, Inc., 764 F.3d 662, 664 (7th Cir. 2014). Atithi has until April 17, 2020, to file an amended complaint containing good-faith allegations sufficient to establish the citizenship of each of Atithi's members. Failure to do so will result in dismissal. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/3/2020. (arw) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AmGUARD Insurance Company, filed by Atithi, LLC. (Graff, Ryan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff Atithi, LLC filed this suit for breach of contract, contending that the court has jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Dkt. #1 . But for the court to exercise jurisdiction under 1332, the parties must be citizens of different states, and Atithi has not provided information sufficient to determine its citizenship. Atithi is a limited liability company, which means that its citizenship is determined by the citizenship of each of its members. Thomas v. Guardsmark, LLC, 487 F.3d 531, 534 (7th Cir. 2007). And if any of the members of Atithi are themselves limited liability companies, partnerships, or other similar entities, then the citizenship of those members and partners must be alleged as well. See Meyerson v. Harrah's E. Chi. Casino, 299 F.3d 616, 617 (7th Cir. 2002) (per curiam). Atithi may have until April 10, 2020, to file and serve an amended complaint containing good-faith allegations sufficient to establish complete diversity of citizenship. The court will dismiss the complaint for lack of jurisdiction if Atithi does not file an amended complaint by the deadline. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/27/2020. (voc) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Atithi, LLC (Graff, Ryan) Modified on 3/23/2020. (lak) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by John Francis Mayer for Plaintiff Atithi, LLC. (Mayer, John) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2648260) filed by Atithi, LLC. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Graff, Ryan) Modified on 3/20/2020: Deleted addresses of both parties. (lak) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan R Graff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean A Bukowski