This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:37:53 (UTC).

Atari Interactive, Inc. v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Atari Interactive, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Becky R. Thorson and Patrick J. Schiltz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00054

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atari Interactive, Inc.

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jorgen M. Lervick

Attorney at DeWitt LLP

2100 At&T Tower, 901 Marquette Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Keith J. Wesley

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Zachary Paul Armstrong

Attorney at DeWitt LLP

2100 At&T Tower, 901 Marquette Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Matthew L Venezia

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Agneles, CA 90067

James T Nikolai

Attorney at DeWitt LLP

2100 At&T Tower, 901 Marquette Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorney

Peter M Routhier

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South 7Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#46

No Description Available

#45

No Description Available

#43

No Description Available

#55

(#55) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Target Corporation. filed by Atari Interactive, Inc.. No summons requested. (Nikolai, James) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#50

No Description Available

47 #1

*Restricted*

#47

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

#39

No Description Available

#34

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

12 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Keith J. Wesley in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Ha

#7

No Description Available

#5

(#5) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Mitchell, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter M Routhier (Routhier, Peter) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew L Venezia for Atari Interactive, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/21/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket(#58) (Text-Only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The pretrial conference is reset to March 16, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Atari, S.A. is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Atari Interactive, Inc.. Atari, S.A. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Plaintiff Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Nikolai, James) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #52 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Keith J. Wesley for Atari Interactive, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/12/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Target Corporation. filed by Atari Interactive, Inc.. No summons requested. (Nikolai, James) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew L. Venezia. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7463763 filed by Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Nikolai, James) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith J. Wesley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7463758 filed by Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Nikolai, James) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett David Katz on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Katz, Brett) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey A. Mitchell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:1114;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1051;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Mitchell, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Atari Interactive, Inc..(Mitchell, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Target Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mitchell, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Target Corporation. Document filed by Atari Interactive, Inc..(Mitchell, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.