This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 at 07:14:16 (UTC).

Mary Atamian v. Aegle Nutrition, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 Mary Atamian filed an Other lawsuit against Aegle Nutrition, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05247

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miray Atamian

Defendant

Aegle Nutrition, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seyed Abbas Kazerounian

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Unit D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Joshua B Swigart

Attorney at Hyde and Swigart APC

2221 Camino Del Rio South Suite 101

San Diego, CA 92108

Nicholas Barthel

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Suite D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Jason A Ibey

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Suite D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

E Crystal Lopez

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo PC

2029 Century Park East Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joshua M Briones

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo PC

2029 Century Park East Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION DEADLINE AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 23-3 #14 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion for class certification shall be determined at a future scheduling conference in this matter. (lom) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

14 #2

Proof of Service

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Joint STIPULATION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Barthel, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC (Lopez, E) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC, identifying Miray Atamian. (Lopez, E) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#11

(#11) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aegle Nutrition, LLC answer now due 8/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC.(Attorney E Crystal Lopez added to party Aegle Nutrition, LLC(pty:dft))(Lopez, E) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#10

(#10) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05247 SVW(PLAx). (rn) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

8 #1

Proof of Service

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian, upon Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marissa Amaya, Person in Charge to John Ramsey as Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Barthel, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC. (et) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian, identifying AEGLE NUTRITION, LLC, TROPICAL OASIS. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23926971 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Miray Atamian(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION DEADLINE AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 23-3 #14 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion for class certification shall be determined at a future scheduling conference in this matter. (lom) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint STIPULATION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Barthel, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC (Lopez, E) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC, identifying Miray Atamian. (Lopez, E) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aegle Nutrition, LLC answer now due 8/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC.(Attorney E Crystal Lopez added to party Aegle Nutrition, LLC(pty:dft))(Lopez, E) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05247 SVW(PLAx). (rn) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian, upon Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marissa Amaya, Person in Charge to John Ramsey as Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Barthel, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Aegle Nutrition, LLC. (et) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian, identifying AEGLE NUTRITION, LLC, TROPICAL OASIS. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23926971 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Miray Atamian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Miray Atamian(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.