This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2020 at 03:52:04 (UTC).

Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Marquez et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 Atain Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Marquez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01672

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atain Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Maria Guadalupe Ochoa

Larry Edward Rodriguez, Jr.

Jose L Gutierrez

Brandon Ramos Estrada

Arturo Rocha, Jr.

Paul Montemurro

Guadalupe Yadhira Villegas Cruz

Raymundo Mendez

Maria T Gutierrez

Heriberto Ramos Estrada

Cirilo Molina

Maria Guadalupe Gonzales

Adan Cruz Santos

Karen M. King

Maria Isabel Molina

Bryce G Rose

Maria Perla-Hernandez Guillen

Lorenzo Marquez

Maricela Solorio Heredia

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas E. Mulvihill

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100, Po Box 12925

San Francisco, CA 94104

Julian J Pardini

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Stephen James Liberatore

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

Joseph R. Beery

Attorney at Farley Law Firm

108 W. Center Ave

Visalia, CA 93291

Michael L. Schulte

Attorney at Attorney At Law

6737 N. Milburn Ave., Suite 160

Fresno, CA 93722

Michael L. Farley

Attorney at Farley Law Firm

108 West Center Avenue

Visalia, CA 93291

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Liberatore, Stephen) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#66

(#66) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Lorenzo Marquez.(Schulte, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#65

(#65) ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT MARQUEZ TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. TEN DAY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/5/2020. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#64

(#64) ORDER DENYING Defendant Marquez's #43 Motion to Dismiss or Stay this Action signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/19/2020. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#63

(#63) ORDER Directing Clerk Of The Court To Terminate Defendants Karen M. King, Damian Lutz, Adan Cruz Santos, Maricela Solorio Heredia, Conrad S Maris, Anh M. Maris, Paul Montemurro, Maria Guadalupe Ochoa, Brandon Ramos Estrada, Heriberto Ramos Estrada, Larry Edward Rodriguez Jr., Agnes A. Rodriguez, Bryce G. Rose, Lesley C. Rose, Maria T. Gutierrez, Jose L. Gutierrez, Francisco J. Gonzalez, Maria Guadalupe Gonzales, Arturo Rocha Jr., Gabriel Sanchez, Maria Perla-Hernandez Guillen, Raymundo Mendez, Domingo Oscar Gabriel, Guadalupe Yadhira Villegas Cruz, Cirilo Molina, And Maria Isabel Molina From This Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/12/2020. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#62

(#62) STIPULATION re #61 Order, DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Liberatore, Stephen) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#61

(#61) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OR REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST THOSE DEFENDANTS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that Plaintiff shall file a stipulation to dismiss certain defendants or a request for entry of default on or before August 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/28/2020. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#60

(#60) DECLARATION of Stephen J. Liberatore re #59 Order,. (Liberatore, Stephen) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#43

(#64) ORDER DENYING Defendant Marquez's #43 Motion to Dismiss or Stay this Action signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/19/2020. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

5 #3

VDRP

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Arturo Rocha, Jr., Agnes A Rodriguez, Larry Edward Rodriguez, Jr., Bryce G Rose, Lesley C Rose, Gabriel Sanchez, Adan Cruz Santos, Guadalupe Yadhira Villegas Cruz* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Maricela Solorio Heredia, Karen M. King, Damian Lutz, Anh M Maris, Conrad S Maris, Lorenzo Marquez, Raymundo Mendez, Cirilo Molina, Maria Isabel Molina, Paul Montemurro* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Brandon Ramos Estrada, Heriberto Ramos Estrada, Domingo Oscar Gabriel, Maria Guadalupe Gonzales, Francisco J Gonzalez, Maria Perla-Hernandez Guillen, Jose L Gutierrez, Maria T Gutierrez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit F TO COMPLAINT

1 #2

Exhibit D AND E TO COMPLAINT

1 #1

Exhibit A, B, AND C TO COMPLAINT

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Pardini, Julian J added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8590227) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, AND C TO COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit D AND E TO COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit F TO COMPLAINT, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pardini, Julian) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Liberatore, Stephen) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Lorenzo Marquez.(Schulte, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT MARQUEZ TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. TEN DAY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/5/2020. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ORDER DENYING Defendant Marquez's #43 Motion to Dismiss or Stay this Action signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/19/2020. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER Directing Clerk Of The Court To Terminate Defendants Karen M. King, Damian Lutz, Adan Cruz Santos, Maricela Solorio Heredia, Conrad S Maris, Anh M. Maris, Paul Montemurro, Maria Guadalupe Ochoa, Brandon Ramos Estrada, Heriberto Ramos Estrada, Larry Edward Rodriguez Jr., Agnes A. Rodriguez, Bryce G. Rose, Lesley C. Rose, Maria T. Gutierrez, Jose L. Gutierrez, Francisco J. Gonzalez, Maria Guadalupe Gonzales, Arturo Rocha Jr., Gabriel Sanchez, Maria Perla-Hernandez Guillen, Raymundo Mendez, Domingo Oscar Gabriel, Guadalupe Yadhira Villegas Cruz, Cirilo Molina, And Maria Isabel Molina From This Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/12/2020. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) STIPULATION re #61 Order, DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Liberatore, Stephen) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OR REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST THOSE DEFENDANTS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that Plaintiff shall file a stipulation to dismiss certain defendants or a request for entry of default on or before August 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/28/2020. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) DECLARATION of Stephen J. Liberatore re #59 Order,. (Liberatore, Stephen) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FURTHER ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OR REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST THOSE DEFENDANTS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for additional time is GRANTED and a stipulation to dismiss certain defendants or a request for entry of default shall be filed on or before July 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/13/2020. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) PROPOSED ORDER re REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FURTHER ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS, OR TO REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO THOSE DEFENDANTS re #56 Order, by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF COUNSEL TO REQUEST FURTHER ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OR TO REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST THOSE DEFENDANTS)(Liberatore, Stephen) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DISREGARDING #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/24/2020. (Orozco, A) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of ERRATA by Atain Specialty Insurance Company re #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.. (Liberatore, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DISREGARDED PURSUANT TO ORDER #10 *** NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Liberatore, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Maria Guadalupe Ochoa* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ADDITION OF COUNSEL by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Liberatore, Stephen James added. (Liberatore, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Arturo Rocha, Jr., Agnes A Rodriguez, Larry Edward Rodriguez, Jr., Bryce G Rose, Lesley C Rose, Gabriel Sanchez, Adan Cruz Santos, Guadalupe Yadhira Villegas Cruz* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Maricela Solorio Heredia, Karen M. King, Damian Lutz, Anh M Maris, Conrad S Maris, Lorenzo Marquez, Raymundo Mendez, Cirilo Molina, Maria Isabel Molina, Paul Montemurro* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Brandon Ramos Estrada, Heriberto Ramos Estrada, Domingo Oscar Gabriel, Maria Guadalupe Gonzales, Francisco J Gonzalez, Maria Perla-Hernandez Guillen, Jose L Gutierrez, Maria T Gutierrez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Julian J Pardini* *Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp* *333 Bush Street, Suite 1100* *SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104*. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Pardini, Julian J added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8590227) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, AND C TO COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit D AND E TO COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit F TO COMPLAINT, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pardini, Julian) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atain Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant