This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2021 at 07:14:51 (UTC).

Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Leeper et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Atain Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Leeper. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Ray, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03086

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atain Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Jeffrey S. Leeper

Ashley F. Leeper

Pyramid Builders Group, LLC

Charles W. Cook, Sr.

Charles W. Cook, Jr.

Charles W. Cook, III

Cook Homes, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Edward Zelonka, Jr.

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman

1230 Peachtree Street, Ste 925

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant Attorneys

Chad Kenneth Reed

Attorney at Busch, Reed, Jones & Leeper, P.C.

639 Whitlock Avenue

Marietta, GA 30064

Cory C. Close

Attorney at Busch, Reed, Jones & Leeper, P.C.

639 Whitlock Avenue

Marietta, GA 30064

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Cook Homes, LLC waiver mailed on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Zelonka, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Charles W. Cook, III waiver mailed on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Zelonka, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Charles W. Cook, Jr. waiver mailed on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Zelonka, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Charles W. Cook, Sr. waiver mailed on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Zelonka, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Pyramid Builders Group, LLC waiver mailed on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Zelonka, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Ashley F. Leeper, Jeffrey S. Leeper. Discovery ends on 2/4/2022.(Close, Cory) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atain Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AJK HOLDINGS LLC for Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Zelonka, Richard) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/9/21. (rlb) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Electronic Summons Issued as to Pyramid Builders Group, LLC. (ayw) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeffrey S. Leeper. (ayw) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Cook Homes, LLC. (ayw) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Charles W. Cook, Sr.. (ayw) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Charles W. Cook, Jr.. (ayw) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Charles W. Cook, III. (ayw) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ashley F. Leeper. (ayw) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11149881) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ayw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atain Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant