This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2022 at 07:39:21 (UTC).

AstraZeneca AB et al v. Alkem Laboratories Limited et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 AstraZeneca AB filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alkem Laboratories Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00354

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AstraZeneca AB

AstraZeneca UK Limited

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Defendants

Alkem Laboratories Limited

S&B Pharma, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Angela Whitesell

Attorney at McCarter & English LLP

405 N. King Street, Ste 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-C

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No Earlier than February 1, 2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: RE46,276 - 10/30/2024; 10,300,065 - 1/27/2036. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: No earlier than August 1, 2024. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE46,276 ;10,300,065. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca UK Limited filed by AstraZeneca UK Limited. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB filed by AstraZeneca AB. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#8

(#8) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Exhibit A-B

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. S&B Pharma, Inc. served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited, S&B Pharma, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 4/11/2022 (nms). (Entered: 04/09/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Angela C. Whitesell as co-counsel.. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to June 13, 2022 - filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Alkem Laboratories Limited answer due 6/13/2022; S&B Pharma, Inc. answer due 6/13/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/11/2022. (nms) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to June 13, 2022 - filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Angela C. Whitesell as co-counsel.. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Alkem Laboratories Limited answer due 5/11/2022; S&B Pharma, Inc. answer due 5/11/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/11/2022. (nms) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Alkem Laboratories Limited, S&B Pharma, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 4/11/2022 (nms). (Entered: 04/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. S&B Pharma, Inc. served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Service of Alkem Laboratories Ltd., by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra) Modified on 3/25/2022 (nms). (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB filed by AstraZeneca AB. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca UK Limited filed by AstraZeneca UK Limited. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE46,276 ;10,300,065. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No Earlier than February 1, 2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: RE46,276 - 10/30/2024; 10,300,065 - 1/27/2036. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: No earlier than August 1, 2024. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Alkem Laboratories Limited, S&B Pharma, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3828706.) - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S&B Pharma, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astrazeneca UK Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Alkem Laboratories Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP is a litigant