This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2020 at 13:45:58 (UTC).

Astellas US LLC et al v. USV Private Limited

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 Astellas US LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against USV Private Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00793

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Astellas US LLC

Astellas Pharma US, Inc.

Defendant

USV Private Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert M. Oakes

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Nitika Gupta Fiorella

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) USV Private Limited's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and (2) USV Private Limited's Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by USV Private Limited.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures and Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 and 4a of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by USV Private Limited. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by USV Private Limited.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. USV Private Limited served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (nmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (nmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas Pharma Inc., Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183; US RE 47,301 E; US 8,524,883. (nmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/13/2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: 2/2/2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/13/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against USV Private Limited - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2988296.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth Laurence Dorsney