This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2021 at 09:57:48 (UTC).

Astellas US LLC et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Astellas US LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Astellas US LLC

Astellas Pharma US, Inc.

Defendant

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashley Nichole Deem

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann, PLLC

300 Summers Street, Suite 1380, P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Daniel R. Higginbotham

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann, PLLC

300 Summers Street, Suite 1380, P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Lisa M. Ferri

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1001

Manuel J. Velez

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1001

Emily R. Whelan

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Kevin M. Yurkerwich

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Amanda L. Major

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Brittany Amadi

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Amy K. Wigmore

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

Lance A Soderstrom

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Deepro R. Mukerjee

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

William J O'Brien

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Jitendra Malik

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP - NC

550 S. Tryon Street, Suite 2900

Charlotte, NC 28202

Gordon H. Copland

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

33 #1

Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist

#33

(#33) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Deem, Ashley) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Jitendra Malik, PH.D to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan Defendant. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/30/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#31

RESTRICTED

30 #1

Proposed Order

#30

(#30) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jitendra Malik) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 03/27/2021)

#29

(#29) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Kevin M. Yurkerwich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Astellas Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/23/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#28

(#28) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Amy Wigmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Astellas Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/23/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#15

(#28) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Amy Wigmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Astellas Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/23/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Higginbotham, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Higginbotham, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#2

(#2) REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (mh) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Prescribing Information

1 #3

Exhibit C - Patent Information

1 #2

Exhibit B - Patent Information

1 #1

Exhibit A - Patent Information

#1

(#5) Summons in a Civil Action Other Document re #1 Complaint, filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Higginbotham, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Deem, Ashley) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Jitendra Malik, PH.D to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan Defendant. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/30/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to J. Malik PAID: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC003154. (wrr) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jitendra Malik) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 03/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Kevin M. Yurkerwich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Astellas Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/23/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Amy Wigmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Astellas Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/23/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Emily Whelan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Astellas Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/23/21. elan(mh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Manuel J. Velez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gilead Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/23/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Lance A. Soderstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/23/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Deepro R. Mukerjee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/23/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brittany Amadi by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deem, Ashley) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Yurkerwich by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deem, Ashley) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 4/12/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/26/2021. Discovery due by 5/10/2021. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/11/21. (mh) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Higginbotham, Daniel) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon H. Copland on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Copland, Gordon) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons in a Civil Action Other Document re #1 Complaint, filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Higginbotham, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Higginbotham, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (Higginbotham, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (mh) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.Filing Fee $402. Receipt #0424-3216119. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent Information, #2 Exhibit B - Patent Information, #3 Exhibit C - Patent Information, #4 Exhibit D - Prescribing Information, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant