This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 09:07:06 (UTC).

Astellas US LLC et al v. Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Astellas US LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01182

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Astellas US LLC

Astellas Pharma US, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Robert M. Oakes

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Nitika Gupta Fiorella

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#10

(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hong Kong King Friend Industrial Co. Ltd. for Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc. by Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#7

(#7) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas Pharma Inc., Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183 ;US RE 47,301 E ;US 8,524,883. (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: August 18, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: February 2, 2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/18/2023. (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3178828.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hong Kong King Friend Industrial Co. Ltd. for Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc. by Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas Pharma Inc., Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183 ;US RE 47,301 E ;US 8,524,883. (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: August 18, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: February 2, 2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 2/18/2023. (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Meitheal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3178828.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M. Oakes