This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2020 at 09:13:04 (UTC).

Astellas US LLC et al v. International Medication Systems, Limited

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 Astellas US LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against International Medication Systems, Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00273

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Astellas US LLC

Astellas Pharma US, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

International Medication Systems, Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Robert M. Oakes

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Nitika Gupta Fiorella

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Natasha E. Daughtrey

John T. Bennett

Attorney at Law Office of Michael R. Abram

115 South Bedford Street

Georgetown, DE 19947

Sarah J Fischer

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Consolidate Action by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER, this case having been recently joined and ready for scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and as this case is listed as related to earlier filed cases that are currently proceeding on an agreed upon schedule entered by the Court; IT IS ORDERED that, on or before April 20, 2020, counsel for the parties shall confer regarding coordination of the cases and submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court or otherwise advise the Court that a separate scheduling conference is needed. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/18/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. International Medication Systems, Ltd.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) 2. International Medication Systems, Ltd.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by International Medication Systems, Limited.(Hoeschen, Nathan) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE of CONFIDENTIAL Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., and Gilead Sciences, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 and 4a of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; and Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John T. Bennett, Sarah J. Fischer and Natasha E. Daughtrey - filed by International Medication Systems, Limited. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#8

(#11) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (sam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (sam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183 ;US RE 47,301 E ;US 8,524,883. (sam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: February 8, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: February 2, 2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 08/08/2022. (sam) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/26/2020) (mal). Modified on 2/26/2020 (mal). (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defenses, And, COUNTERCLAIM against Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc. by International Medication Systems, Limited.(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCase associated with lead case: Create association to 1:18-cv-01675-CFC-CJB. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN C.A. No. 18-1675-CFC. (fms) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (15 in 1:20-cv-00273-CFC) Stipulation To Consolidate Action filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. C.A. No. 20-00273-CFC and C.A. No. 18-1675-CFC are consolidated for all purposes; All future filings shall be made in C.A. No. 18-1675-CFC. ( See stipulation for further details and deadlines). Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/30/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00273-CFC, 1:18-cv-01675-CFC-CJB(fms) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Consolidate Action by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER, this case having been recently joined and ready for scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and as this case is listed as related to earlier filed cases that are currently proceeding on an agreed upon schedule entered by the Court; IT IS ORDERED that, on or before April 20, 2020, counsel for the parties shall confer regarding coordination of the cases and submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court or otherwise advise the Court that a separate scheduling conference is needed. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/18/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. International Medication Systems, Ltd.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) 2. International Medication Systems, Ltd.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by International Medication Systems, Limited.(Hoeschen, Nathan) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE of CONFIDENTIAL Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., and Gilead Sciences, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 and 4a of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; and Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah J Fischer,Natasha E. Daughtrey,John T. Bennett for International Medication Systems, Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John T. Bennett, Sarah J. Fischer and Natasha E. Daughtrey filed by International Medication Systems, Limited. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/11/2020. (fms) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John T. Bennett, Sarah J. Fischer and Natasha E. Daughtrey - filed by International Medication Systems, Limited. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defenses, And, COUNTERCLAIM against Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc. by International Medication Systems, Limited.(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. International Medication Systems, Limited served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to International Medication Systems, Limited on 2/25/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (sam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (sam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183 ;US RE 47,301 E ;US 8,524,883. (sam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: February 8, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: February 2, 2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 08/08/2022. (sam) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/26/2020) (mal). Modified on 2/26/2020 (mal). (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against International Medication Systems, Limited - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2862660.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL MEDICATION SYSTEMS LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant