This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2020 at 19:14:11 (UTC).

Astellas US LLC et al v. Hospira, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 Astellas US LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hospira, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00893

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Astellas US LLC

Astellas Pharma US, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Hospira, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Robert M. Oakes

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Nitika Gupta Fiorella

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Gregory J. Winter

Jovial Wong

Charles B. Klein

Claire A. Fundakowski

Dominick T. Gattuso

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory J. Winter for Hospira, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Claire A. Fundakowski for Hospira, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCase associated with lead case: Create association to 1:18-cv-01675-CFC-CJB. ALL FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN C.A. NO. 18-1675-CFC. (fms) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (11 in 1:20-cv-00893-CFC) Stipulation to Consolidate Action filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. C.A. No. 20-893-CFC and C.A. No. 18-1675-CFC are consolidated forall purposes;All filings shall be made in C.A. No. 18-1675-CFC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00893-CFC, 1:18-cv-01675-CFC-CJB(fms) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Charles B. Klein for Hospira, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Jovial Wong for Hospira, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles B. Klein, Jovial Wong, Claire A. Fundakowski, and Gregory J. Winter filed by Hospira, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/13/2020. (fms) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Stipulation and Proposed Order to Consolidate Action by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hospira, Inc.s Core Technical Documents Bates labeled HOS00000001 - HOS00004839 [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Hospira, Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles B. Klein, Jovial Wong, Claire A. Fundakowski, and Gregory J. Winter - filed by Hospira, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for Hospira, Inc. filed by Hospira, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Hospira, Inc.'s Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc. by Hospira, Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (mal) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (mal) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. Astellas Pharma Inc. is the sole shareholder of Astellas US Holding, Inc. filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (mal) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183 ;US RE 47,301 E ;US 8,524,883. (mal) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: June 16, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: February 2, 2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 12/16/2022. (mal) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Hospira, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3028894.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hospira, Inc. is a litigant