This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 07:08:31 (UTC).

Astellas US LLC et al v. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Astellas US LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01785

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Astellas US LLC

Astellas Pharma US, Inc.

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Defendant

Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelly A Del Dotto

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floorp.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3768774.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/13/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 2/2/2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 5/13/2024. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183; US RE 47,301 E; US 8,524,883. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas Pharma Inc. and Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Del Dotto, Kelly) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lisa M. Ferri and Manuel J. Velez - filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Del Dotto, Kelly) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lisa M. Ferri and Manuel J. Velez filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/19/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lisa M. Ferri and Manuel J. Velez - filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Del Dotto, Kelly) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Del Dotto, Kelly) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas Pharma Inc. and Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183; US RE 47,301 E; US 8,524,883. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/13/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 2/2/2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 5/13/2024. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3768774.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation is a litigant