This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2020 at 09:48:01 (UTC).

Astellas US LLC et al v. Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 Astellas US LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00516

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Astellas US LLC

Astellas Pharma US, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Robert M. Oakes

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Nitika Gupta Fiorella

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Joseph M. Reisman

Benjamin A. Katzenellenbogen

William R. Zimmerman

Kimberly A. Kennedy

James S. Green, Jr.

Attorney at Seitz, Van Ogtrop & Green, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500, P.O. Box 68

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#12

11 #1

Certificate of Service

#11

10 #1

Certificate of Service

#10

9 #4

Certification of William R. Zimmerman

9 #2

Certification of Joseph Reisman

9 #1

Certification of Ben Katzenellebogen

#9

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Kimberly A. Kennedy for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Ben Katzenellebogen for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph M. Reisman for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney William R. Zimmerman for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim to Defendant's Counterclaim by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Green, James) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, of Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Green, James) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ben Katzenellebogen, Joseph Reisman, Kimberly A. Kennedy and William R. Zimmerman filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/2/2020. (fms) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ben Katzenellebogen, Joseph Reisman, Kimberly A. Kennedy and William R. Zimmerman - filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ben Katzenellebogen, #2 Certification of Joseph Reisman, #3 Certification of Kimberly Kennedy, #4 Certification of William R. Zimmerman)(Green, James) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 8, 2020 filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited answer due 6/8/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/6/2020. (fms) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 8, 2020 - filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Green, James) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Astellas Pharma US, Inc.. Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (mal) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (mal) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. Astellas Pharma Inc. is the sole shareholder of Astellas US Holding, Inc. filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (mal) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183 ;US RE 47,301 E ;US 8,524,883. (mal) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: April 2, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: February 2, 2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: October 2, 2022. (mal) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2900469.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Astellas Pharma US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant