Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/08/2020 at 12:55:30 (UTC).

Astellas US LLC et al v. Gland Pharma Limited

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 Astellas US LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Gland Pharma Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00347

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Astellas US LLC

Astellas Pharma US, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Gland Pharma Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Robert M. Oakes

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Nitika Gupta Fiorella

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Stephen M. Hash

Emily Pyclik

Stephen C. Stout

David M. Fry

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Fosun Pharma Industrial PTE. Ltd, Other Affiliate Fosun Industrial Co., Ltd, Other Affiliate Shanghai Fosun Pharmaceutical (Group) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Shanghai Fosun High Technology (Group) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Fosun International Ltd., Other Affiliate Fosun Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Fosun International Holdings Ltd. for Gland Pharma Limited filed by Gland Pharma Limited. (Fry, David) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc. by Gland Pharma Limited.(Fry, David) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen M. Hash, Stephen C. Stout and Emily Pyclik - filed by Gland Pharma Limited. (Fry, David) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents And Things To Defendant Gland Pharma Limited filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Gland Pharma Limited waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas Pharma Inc., Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183; US RE 47,301 E; US 8,524,883. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 2/25/2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: 2/2/2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/25/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Gland Pharma Limited - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2873332.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Fosun Pharma Industrial PTE. Ltd, Other Affiliate Fosun Industrial Co., Ltd, Other Affiliate Shanghai Fosun Pharmaceutical (Group) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Shanghai Fosun High Technology (Group) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Fosun International Ltd., Other Affiliate Fosun Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Fosun International Holdings Ltd. for Gland Pharma Limited filed by Gland Pharma Limited. (Fry, David) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc. by Gland Pharma Limited.(Fry, David) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Stephen M. Hash, Stephen C. Stout, Emily Pyclik for Gland Pharma Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen M. Hash, Stephen C. Stout and Emily Pyclik filed by Gland Pharma Limited. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/17/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen M. Hash, Stephen C. Stout and Emily Pyclik - filed by Gland Pharma Limited. (Fry, David) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents And Things To Defendant Gland Pharma Limited filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Gland Pharma Limited waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Gland Pharma Limited on 3/17/2020. (myr) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas Pharma Inc., Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183; US RE 47,301 E; US 8,524,883. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 2/25/2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: 2/2/2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/25/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Gland Pharma Limited - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2873332.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLAND PHARMA LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant