This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2021 at 09:54:51 (UTC).

Astellas US LLC et al v. American Regent, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Astellas US LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against American Regent, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00671

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Astellas US LLC

Astellas Pharma US, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

American Regent, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Robert M. Oakes

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Nitika Gupta Fiorella

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited for American Regent, Inc. filed by American Regent, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 28, 2021 - filed by American Regent, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Stamatios Stamoulis on behalf of American Regent, Inc. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183 ;US RE 47,301 E ;US 8,524,883. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 03/27/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 02/2/2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 9/27/2023. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed against American Regent, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3610810.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCorporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., Corporate Parent Daiichi Sankyo U.S. Holdings, Inc. for American Regent, Inc.. (fms) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited for American Regent, Inc. filed by American Regent, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) [SEALED] ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by American Regent, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 28, 2021 filed by American Regent, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: American Regent, Inc. answer due 6/28/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/13/2021. (fms) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 28, 2021 - filed by American Regent, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Stamatios Stamoulis on behalf of American Regent, Inc. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC filed by Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Astellas US LLC. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,106,183 ;US RE 47,301 E ;US 8,524,883. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 03/27/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 02/2/2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 9/27/2023. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against American Regent, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3610810.) - filed by Astellas US LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN REGENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant