This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 08:01:53 (UTC).

Astellas Pharma Inc. et al v. Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Astellas Pharma Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01771

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Astellas Pharma Inc.

Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.

Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.

Defendants

Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.

Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd.

Huahai US Inc.

Solco Healthcare US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare US LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3765810.) - filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No Earlier than November 2, 2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: No earlier than September 28, 2029 (March 28, 2030 pediatric exclusivity expiration). Thirty Month Stay Deadline: No Earlier than May 2, 2024. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,842,780. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.; Corporate Parent Astellas B.V. for Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd. filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Huahai US Inc. on 12/17/2021. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Solco Healthcare US LLC on 12/17/2021. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. on 12/17/2021. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. on 12/17/2021. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Case Consolidation by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase associated with lead case: Create association to 1:20-cv-01589-JFB-CJB. (mlc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSO ORDERED D.I. (10 in 1:21-cv-01771-JFB, 246 in 1:20-cv-01589-JFB-CJB) Stipulation regarding case consolidation filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/10/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01771-JFB, 1:20-cv-01589-JFB-CJB(mlc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketORAL ORDER - Pursuant to the filing of this case, the Court issues the following order: Magistrate Judge Burke shall issue a scheduling order when appropriate. Magistrate Judge Burke shall handle all nondispositive matters on all issues, except for Daubert motions, Markman hearings, and pretrial motions in limine. The parties have the right to file an appeal of the magistrate judge's order, and the same shall be decided by the undersigned. The magistrate judge shall likewise handle all discovery matters, scheduling, and pretrial conferences. If the parties believe the magistrate judge has a conflict of interest with this case, the parties shall so notify the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 01/10/22. (AEV) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Case Consolidation by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bataillon of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska, due to related cases. Please include the initials of the Judge (JFB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. on 12/17/2021. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. on 12/17/2021. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Solco Healthcare US LLC on 12/17/2021. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Huahai US Inc. on 12/17/2021. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.; Corporate Parent Astellas B.V. for Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd. filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,842,780. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No Earlier than November 2, 2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: No earlier than September 28, 2029 (March 28, 2030 pediatric exclusivity expiration). Thirty Month Stay Deadline: No Earlier than May 2, 2024. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare US LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3765810.) - filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL, CO., LTD is a litigant