This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2021 at 09:53:19 (UTC).

Astellas Pharma Inc. et al v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Astellas Pharma Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F. Bataillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00425

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.

Astellas Pharma Inc.

Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.

Defendants

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cadila Healthcare Ltd. doing business as Zydus Cadila

Actavis LLC

Lupin Ltd.

Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.

Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.

Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.

Aurolife Pharma LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Certification of J. Leonard

7 #1

Certification of S. Roberts

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simon D. Roberts and Jason A. Leonard - filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of S. Roberts, #2 Certification of J. Leonard)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas B.V. for Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.; Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. - filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc. (kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,842,780. (kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 3/9/2021, 3/16/2021, 3/3/2021, 2/8/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 9/28/2029.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: See Attached. (kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed against Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis LLC, Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurolife Pharma LLC, Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3578624.) - filed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simon D. Roberts and Jason A. Leonard - filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of S. Roberts, #2 Certification of J. Leonard)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bataillon of the U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska, due to related cases. Please include the initials of the Judge (JFB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Astellas B.V. for Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.; Corporate Parent Astellas US Holding, Inc. for Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. - filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc. (kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,842,780. (kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 3/9/2021, 3/16/2021, 3/3/2021, 2/8/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 9/28/2029.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: See Attached. (kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed against Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis LLC, Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurolife Pharma LLC, Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3578624.) - filed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas Pharma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant