This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2021 at 09:21:40 (UTC).

Astellas Pharma Inc. et al v. Alkem Laboratories Ltd.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Astellas Pharma Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alkem Laboratories Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00992

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Astellas Pharma Inc.

Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.

Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.

Defendant

Alkem Laboratories Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jason A. Leonard

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Certifications for Simon D. Roberts and Jason A. Leonard

#12

(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simon D. Roberts and Jason A. Leonard - filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Simon D. Roberts and Jason A. Leonard)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit A-B

#7

(#7) DECLARATION of Service on Alkem Laboratories Ltd. made on July 7, 2021 by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#6

(#6) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc. (kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,342,117; 7,982,049; 8,835,474; 10,842,780; RE44,872. (kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/25/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: see attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/25/2023. (kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - E

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed against Alkem Laboratories Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3651189.) - filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Jason A. Leonard for Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.,for Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.,for Astellas Pharma Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simon D. Roberts and Jason A. Leonard filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/18/2021. (dlb) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simon D. Roberts and Jason A. Leonard - filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Simon D. Roberts and Jason A. Leonard)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#11) ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and discuss, in person and/or by telephone, each of the matters listed on Judge Burke's Case Management Checklist (Checklist). Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall jointly file the following: (i) a copy of the Checklist, indicating the names of Lead Counsel and Delaware Counsel for each party; (ii) a proposed Scheduling Order, which is consistent with Judge Burke/s "Rule 16 Scheduling Order - Patent" (and with additional changes made to accommodate the fact that this is an ANDA litigation matter); and (iii) a letter, not to exceed three pages, that contains the following: (a) a description of what this case is about; (b) the parties' positions regarding any disputes in the proposed Scheduling Order, and (c) a list of the three most significant topics (other than Scheduling Order disputes) discussed during the parties review of the Checklist items, along with a brief description as to what was discussed as to those topics. Thereafter, the Court may schedule a Case Management Conference/Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to be held with Judge Burke. The Checklist and Scheduling Order can be found on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's website. Orderned by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/11/2021. (dlb) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketREMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:#http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf (dlb) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#10) ORAL ORDER Pursuant to the filing of this case, the Court issues the following order: Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke shall issue a scheduling order when appropriate. Magistrate Judge Burke shall handle all nondispositive matters on all issues, except for Daubert motions, Markman hearings, and pretrial motions in limine. The parties have the right to file an appeal of the magistrate judge's order, and the same shall be decided by the undersigned. The magistrate judge shall likewise handle all discovery matters, scheduling, and pretrial conferences. If the parties believe the magistrate judge has a conflict of interest with this case, the parties shall so notify the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 08/06/21. (AEV) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Service on Alkem Laboratories Ltd. made on July 7, 2021 by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bataillon of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska, due to prior related cases. Please include the initials of the Judge (JFB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc. (kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,342,117; 7,982,049; 8,835,474; 10,842,780; RE44,872. (kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/25/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: see attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/25/2023. (kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed against Alkem Laboratories Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3651189.) - filed by Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alkem Laboratories Limited is a litigant