This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/18/2020 at 10:05:21 (UTC).

Assumption Parish Police Jury v. Allergan PLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 Assumption Parish Police Jury filed an Other lawsuit against Allergan PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby, Jane Triche Milazzo and Ivan L.R. Lemelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01772

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judges

Jane Triche Milazzo

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

 

Party Details

Defendants

Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Anda, Inc.

Sandoz, Inc.

Actavis Kadian LLC

McKesson Corporation

Actavis Elizabeth, LLC

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Actavis South Atlantic LLC

Warner Chilcott Company, LLC

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Allergan Sales, L.L.C.

Amneal Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Allergan Finance LLC

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Leland G. Horton

Attorney at Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea, LLC (Shreveport)

401 Edwards Street, Suite 1000

Shreveport, LA 71101

Natalie J. Taylor

Attorney at Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Shannon Marie Jaeckel

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention Street, Suite 1001

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

David Wayne O'Quinn

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Madison Sharko

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

Stacey Denise Williams

Attorney at Blanchard, Walker, O'Quin & Roberts, APLC

333 Texas Street, Suite 700

Shreveport, LA 71101

Thomas Mac Dougall Womack

Attorney at Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips LLP

450 Laurel Street, 8Th Floor (70801), P. O. Box 2471

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-2471

Franklin J. Foil

Attorney at Franklin J. Foil, Attorney at Law

412 N Fourth Street, Suite 240

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Other Attorneys

S. Brian Perry

Attorney at Allen & Gooch, A Law Corporation (Lafayette)

2000 Kaliste Saloom Rd., Suite 400

Lafayette, LA 70508

Shelley K. Napolitano

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy LLC (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2411

New Orleans, LA 70170

Tyler D. Trew

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

John Francis Olinde

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Karen M. Fontana

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Kathryn Marie Knight

Attorney at Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann, LLC (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3150

New Orleans, LA 70112-4042

James Alcee Brown

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Walter John Leger, Jr.

Attorney at Leger & Shaw (New Orleans)

935 Gravier Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70112

Glenn Michael Farnet

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700, Po Box 3513 (70821-3513)

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Eric Joseph Santana

Attorney at Santana & Blanchard, LLC

3500 N. Hullen Street, Suite 17K

Metairie, LA 70002

Peter Joseph Rotolo, III

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Franklin G. Shaw

Attorney at Leger & Shaw (New Orleans)

935 Gravier Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70112

24 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #1

Transmittal Letter

#13

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

#9

8 #3

Proposed Order

8 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

#8

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Receipt of Case Transfer to Northern District of Ohio (ko) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(ko) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (ko) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission of Motion for Remand by Actavis LLC, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants shall have up to, through and including 30 days after the later of (1) this Court's ruling on the motion to remand or (2) the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation enters a final order granting a motion to vacate the Conditional Transfer Order or a final decision otherwise denying transfer to the MDL. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 07/02/2020. (ko) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Jane Triche Milazzo recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/1/2020. (NEF to case managers)(am) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Assumption Parish Police Jury. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Landry, Matthew) Modified text on 7/1/2020 (am). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Actavis LLC identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis LLC (Crisler, Richard) Modified text on 6/30/2020 (am). (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Actavis LLC Supplemental Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crisler, Richard) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by McKesson Corporation . (Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 6/23/2020 (am). (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, case number 37752 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8365288) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)Attorney Stacey Denise Williams added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Williams, Stacey) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Anda, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allergan Finance LLC is a litigant