This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:34:22 (UTC).

ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. v. BELL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BELL FLAVORS FRAGRANCES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JAN E. DUBOIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05736

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAN E. DUBOIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Defendants

TERRY BETHMAN

BELL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REX F. BRIEN, JR.

Attorney at Bodell Bove LLC

1845 Walnut Street, Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

LOUIS A. BOVE

Attorney at BODELL BOVE LLC.

1845 Walnut St Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon Bell Flavors & Fragrances, Inc. by Waiver of the Service of Summons on 12/19/19 (BRIEN, REX) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

1 #4

TRACK FORM

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BELL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., TERRY BETHMAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 207842.), filed by ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A, #2 EXHIBIT B, #3 EXHIBIT C, #4 TRACK FORM, #5 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #6 DESIGNATION FORM)(sg, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by John Jones re: served Complaint with attachments upon Terry Bethman by personal service on 12/17/19 (BRIEN, REX) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

1 #3

EXHIBIT C

1 #1

EXHIBIT A

1 #6

DESIGNATION FORM

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent AMTRUST NORTH AMERICA OF FLORIDA, INC., Corporate Parent AMTRUST FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (AFSI) for ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. by ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC..(sg, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #5

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #2

EXHIBIT B

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon Bell Flavors & Fragrances, Inc. by Waiver of the Service of Summons on 12/19/19 (BRIEN, REX) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by John Jones re: served Complaint with attachments upon Terry Bethman by personal service on 12/17/19 (BRIEN, REX) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • 2 Summons Issued as to BELL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., TERRY BETHMAN. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 12/9/2019 (sg, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent AMTRUST NORTH AMERICA OF FLORIDA, INC., Corporate Parent AMTRUST FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (AFSI) for ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. by ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC..(sg, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BELL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., TERRY BETHMAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 207842.), filed by ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A, #2 EXHIBIT B, #3 EXHIBIT C, #4 TRACK FORM, #5 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #6 DESIGNATION FORM)(sg, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.