This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2019 at 07:01:43 (UTC).

Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. v. Bay Area Air Quality Management District

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Bay Area Air Quality Management District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donna M. Ryu and Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-05277

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Donna M. Ryu

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.

Defendant

Bay Area Air Quality Management District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan Palmer Jacobus

Attorney at Alan Palmer Jacobus, Attorney-at-Law

981 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94013

Defendant Attorneys

Joel Freid

Attorney at Bay Area Air Quality Management District

375 Beale Street, Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94105

John D Green

Attorney at Farella Braun Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Bay Area Air Quality Management District and Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Green, John) (Filed on 10/18/2019) Modified on 10/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOHN D. GREEN OF FARELLA BRAUN + MARTEL ON BEHALF OF BAY AREA AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT by Bay Area Air Quality Management District (Green, John) (Filed on 10/18/2019) Modified on 10/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSTION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Bay Area Air Quality Management District and Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Freid, Joel) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. on Bay Area Air Quality Mgmt Dist. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 9/5/2019) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#11

(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Bay Area Air Quality Management District. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#5

(#5) CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/26/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amtrust Financial Services, Inc. for Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. LR 3-15 Certificate (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/23/2019) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amtrust Financial Services, Inc. for Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Letter

1 #3

Exhibit Letter

1 #2

Exhibit Policy

1 #1

Exhibit Underlying Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Bay Area Air Quality Management District and Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Green, John) (Filed on 10/18/2019) Modified on 10/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOHN D. GREEN OF FARELLA BRAUN + MARTEL ON BEHALF OF BAY AREA AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT by Bay Area Air Quality Management District (Green, John) (Filed on 10/18/2019) Modified on 10/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSTION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Bay Area Air Quality Management District and Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Freid, Joel) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Corre ct initials are: "JST."Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #12 Certificate of Service filed by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. on Bay Area Air Quality Mgmt Dist. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 9/5/2019) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Bay Area Air Quality Management District. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Summons. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/26/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amtrust Financial Services, Inc. for Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. LR 3-15 Certificate (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/23/2019) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amtrust Financial Services, Inc. for Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief (with jury demand) against Bay Area Air Quality Management District (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13641808). Filed by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit Policy, #3 Exhibit Letter, #4 Exhibit Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bay Area Air Quality Management District is a litigant

Latest cases where Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D Green