This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2021 at 08:03:52 (UTC).

Associated Builders & Contractors of New Mexico et al v. County of Bernalillo

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Associated Builders Contractors of New Mexico filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Bernalillo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerry H. Ritter and Kirtan Khalsa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00412

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

Presiding Judge

Kirtan Khalsa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kaufman Fire Protection Systems, Inc.

Orcom, a Division of Ortega Companies, Inc.

Bruce Swansinger

Del Rio Enterprises, Inc.

Aaroon Maestas

Garvin Construction, Inc.

Mark Carrillo

Ismael Teran

Northridge Electric, a Divsion of Burgos Group

Matthew Stuckey

Mark Hancock

Associated Builders & Contractors of New Mexico

Morgan's Constructive Solutions, LLC

Jerry Morgan

ISHC, Inc.

Richie Villanueva

Klinger Constructors Inc.

Carl Benward

Ray Smith

Defendant

County of Bernalillo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leah M Stevens-Block

Attorney at Jackson Loman Stanford & Downey, P.C.

201 Third Street Nw, Suite 1500

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Sarah K Downey

Attorney at Jackson Loman Stanford & Downey, P.C.

201 Third Street Nw, Suite 1500

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Stanley M Gosch

Attorney at Rosenblatt & Gosch PLLC

8085 E Prentice Ave

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Jessica J. Randall

Attorney at Bernalillo County Attorneys Office

520 Lomas Blvd. Nw, Ste 4Th Floor

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Richard Rosenblatt

Attorney at Rosenblatt & Gosch PLLC

8085 E. Prentice Avenue

Greenwood Village, CO 80111-2745

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Rosenblatt on behalf of County of Bernalillo (Rosenblatt, Richard) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley M Gosch on behalf of County of Bernalillo (Gosch, Stanley) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by County of Bernalillo re #1 Complaint,, Notice of Agreed Extension of Time (Randall, Jessica) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica J. Randall on behalf of County of Bernalillo (Randall, Jessica) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Associated Builders & Contractors of New Mexico. County of Bernalillo served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (Stevens-Block, Leah) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to County of Bernalillo. (jg) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7671333 re #1 Complaint,, filed by Orcom, a Division of Ortega Companies, Inc., Kaufman Fire Protection Systems, Inc., Richie Villanueva, Matthew Stuckey, Morgan's Constructive Solutions, LLC, Associated Builders & Contractors of New Mexico, Bruce Swansinger, Mark Carrillo, Carl Benward, Klinger Constructors Inc., Del Rio Enterprises, Inc., Mark Hancock, Ray Smith, Aaroon Maestas, Garvin Construction, Inc., Jerry Morgan, Ismael Teran, Northridge Electric, a Divsion of Burgos Group, ISHC, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stevens-Block, Leah) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against County of Bernalillo ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Bruce Swansinger, Ray Smith, ISHC, Inc., Del Rio Enterprises, Inc., Associated Builders & Contractors of New Mexico, Carl Benward, Northridge Electric, a Divsion of Burgos Group, Mark Hancock, Orcom, a Division of Ortega Companies, Inc., Kaufman Fire Protection Systems, Inc., Aaroon Maestas, Matthew Stuckey, Richie Villanueva, Mark Carrillo, Klinger Constructors Inc., Jerry Morgan, Ismael Teran, Garvin Construction, Inc., Morgan's Constructive Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevens-Block, Leah) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Associated Builders and Contractors Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stanley Miller Gosch